Akers v. Gregory Funding et al
Plaintiff: James G. Akers
Defendant: Gregory Funding, Wilson & Associates, PLLC, Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F, Bank of America Corporation and Wheelhouse Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00693
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On September 7, 2021, Plaintiff filed a first amended emergency petition for relief that replaced his original pleading and became the operative pleading in the case. Bank of America, N.A., was listed as a defendant in the original pleading filed by Plaintiff, albeit improperly named, but is not included in the first amended emergency petition for relief. Wheelhouse Partners, LLC, was likewise named in the original pleading but is not included in the amended pleading. Plaintiff's non-inclusion of these two entities as defendants in the operative complaint effectively removed them from the case. Accordingly, the motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. #15 ) is moot and the Clerk is directed to terminate the motion to dismiss as a pending motion without any determination on the merits. Any party objecting to this Order may do so by filing a motion for review no later than fourteen (14) days from the date this Order is served upon the party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/25/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Emergency Petition for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief filed by Bank of America Corporation . (Wright, Heather)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Emergency Petition for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief by Bank of America Corporation. (Wright, Heather)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Howard Keith Morrison admitted to this court. (ln)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Wilson & Associates, PLLC.(Morrison, Howard)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Because Plaintiff has not met the procedural or substantive requirements for a TRO, the Amended TRO Motion (Doc. No. #10 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Plaintiff is notified that he is responsible for effecting service of process on Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/8/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F, Gregory Funding, and Wilson & Associates, PLLC. Service copies returned to Plaintiff by regular mail. (ln)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 AMENDED MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by James G. Akers. (ln)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by James G. Akers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(ln)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED EMERGENCY PETITION FOR DECLARATORY & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F, Gregory Funding, and Wilson & Associates, PLLC filed by James G. Akers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Multiple Exhibits)(ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court concludes that Plaintiff has failed to establish that this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over the claims in this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order #2 is DENIED for lack of showing of jurisdiction. Plaintiff may refile his motion if he is able to explain why this Court has diversity jurisdiction given the citizenship of the defendants who are currently named on his current claims in this suit. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/3/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F, Bank of America Corporation, Gregory Funding, Wheelhouse Partners, LLC, and Wilson & Associates, PLLC. Service copies returned to Plaintiff at Intake window. (ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECEIPT #34675063476 in the amount of $402.00 posted by James G. Akers re #1 Emergency Petition for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief. (ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by James G. Akers. (ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by James G. Akers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Restraining Orders)(ln)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION FOR DECLARATORY & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F, Bank of America Corporation, Gregory Funding, Wheelhouse Partners, LLC, Wilson & Associates, PLLC, filed by James G. Akers.(lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2021: #1 Exhibit 1 - Multiple Exhibits part 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Multiple Exhibits part 2, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet) (ln).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akers v. Gregory Funding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Howard Keith Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2019-F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Heather Howell Wright
Represented By: Judea S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheelhouse Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?