Gendron v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: Derek P. Gendron
Defendant: Gregory J. McCoy and Cunningham Dalman PC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00717
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Cunningham Dalman PC, Gregory J. McCoy re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Derek P. Gendron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Screenshot of webpage)(Mangelsdorf, Richard)
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Derek P. Gendron. (ln)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: the Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Case Filing Authorization (Docket No. #14 ) is DENIED without PREJUDICE to refile after the Plaintiff has completed any training or other requirements of the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/3/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Electronic Case Filing Authorization by Derek P. Gendron. (ln)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: MOTION #10 to Strike Motion #8 to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/26/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.)(ln)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cunningham Dalman PC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of McCoy, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of VanderVeen)(Mangelsdorf, Richard)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cunningham Dalman PC. (Mangelsdorf, Richard)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Cunningham Dalman PC. (Mangelsdorf, Richard) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (ln).
October 25, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 -1: The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Other Documents/Memorandum in Support. Counsel shall re-file the document. Also, Counsel who signed this pleading shall re-file this document using his or her own CM/ECF filing credentials. (ln) Modified on 10/25/2021 (ln).
October 25, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The document is not signed. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/" or inserted facsimile signature. Counsel shall re-file the document. (ln)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 ****DISREGARD. Documents at #8 were disregarded due to no signature on Motion.**** CERTIFICATE of Service (additional address added to original certificates for Doc. No. 8) filed by Cunningham Dalman PC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cunningham Dalman PC. (Mangelsdorf, Richard) Modified on 10/25/2021 (ln).
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 ****DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cunningham Dalman PC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gregory J. McCoy, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Ronald J. VanderVeen)(Mangelsdorf, Richard) Modified on 10/25/2021 (ln).
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Derek P. Gendron. Cunningham Dalman PC served on 10/1/2021. (ln)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Derek P. Gendron. Gregory J. McCoy served on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter (updating mailing address))(ln)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Cunningham Dalman PC and Gregory J. McCoy. Service copies returned to Plaintiff at Intake window. (ln)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Accordingly, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/21/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cunningham Dalman PC and Gregory J. McCoy (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675063611) filed by Derek P. Gendron. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Receipt for Filing Fee)(ln)
September 15, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gendron v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek P. Gendron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Dalman PC
Represented By: Richard C. Mangelsdorf, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?