Jackson v. Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness et al
Plaintiff: Nicol Jackson
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania and Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2021cv00720
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing date correction by Nicol Jackson re #1 Complaint. (kc)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons issued as to Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on Red Mill Road in New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, and Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Service packet forwarded to USM.) (kc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Because the plaintiff's IFP application #2 reflects that she lacks sufficient financial resources to pay the full filing fee in advance without undue hardship, it is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send the plaintiff four service packets. The plaintiff MUST complete one service packet for each defendant, and return the four completed service packets to the Clerk's Office within 21 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, regarding required initial discovery disclosures, shall not apply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (xc: 4 service packets and Order forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 10/7/2021 (kc).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicol Jackson. (kc)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on King Drive, New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on Red Mill Road in New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, and Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, filed by Nicol Jackson.(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicol Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?