MK2 Wholesale, LLC v. DiBar Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MK2 Wholesale, LLC
Defendant: DiBar Labs, LLC, Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc. and GPP Marketing Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00759
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 25 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GPP Marketing Group, LLC. (Martin, Carolina)
November 29, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memo in Support by GPP Marketing Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of John Anastio)(Martin, Carolina)
November 29, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GPP Marketing Group, LLC. (Martin, Carolina)
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc.. (Martin, Carolina)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: MOTION #20 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to January 14, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/22/2021. (mg)
November 22, 2021 Reset Hearings: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/14/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to DiBar Labs, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. GPP Marketing Group, LLC served on 11/17/2021. (Ferraro, Sarah)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Dibar Labs, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memo in Support filed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Frank Brinkman)(Ferraro, Sarah)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by MK2 Wholesale, LLC as to DiBar Labs, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah)
November 2, 2021 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc.. (Martin, Carolina)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memo in Support by Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Gregory Stanbury)(Martin, Carolina)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc.. (Martin, Carolina)
October 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah)
October 22, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 , #10 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. Scan as one document with the "Return Copy" Summons as your lead document.) (mg) Modified on 10/22/2021 (mg).
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD*** GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed (Correcting D.E. 9) Acknowledgement filed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah) Modified on 10/22/2021 (mg).
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD*** SUMMONS returned executed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc. served on 10/12/2021. (Ferraro, Sarah) Modified on 10/22/2021 (mg).
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Ferraro, Sarah)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to DiBar Labs, LLC, GPP Marketing Group, LLC, Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Sarahby Ferraro) mail. (mg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
October 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for David P. Canas and Sarah M. Ferraro admitted to this court. (mg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DiBar Labs, LLC, GPP Marketing Group, LLC, Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3459769), filed by MK2 Wholesale, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MK2 Wholesale, LLC v. DiBar Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MK2 Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: David P. Canas
Represented By: Sarah M. Ferraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiBar Labs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oranges to Dollars Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Carolina V. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPP Marketing Group, LLC
Represented By: Carolina V. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?