Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Various John Does et al
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Defendant: Various John Does, Various Jane Does and XYZ Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00762
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Motion #30 to continue the initial case management conference is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 1/24/2022 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/15/2021. (mg)
November 15, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Burns, Cara)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SEIZURE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/19/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 18, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/18/2021. Defendants did not appear. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Roxann Harkins.) (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
October 15, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#28 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of John Carruthers filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. re: #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Infring Merch, #3 Exhibit C - Proofs of Service)(Burns, Cara)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the show cause hearing scheduled for October 18, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. will take place by telephone. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the telephone conference. Magistrate Judge Frensley will be presiding over the telephone hearing in Judge Trauger's courtroom, so that if any people appear for the hearing, objections may be dealt with. If no one appears for the hearing, counsel for the plaintiff shall prepare an appropriate proposed order for Judge Trauger's consideration. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/13/2021. (kc)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion for Leave for Counsel to Appear at 10/18/2021 Order to Show Cause Hearing. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/12/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 12, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear (Request) Regarding Counsel at OSC Hearing 10/18/2021 by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Burns, Cara) Modified on 10/13/2021 (kc).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Cara R. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/08/2021. (lh)
October 7, 2021 Filing 23 RECEIPT #34675063830 in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. re #17 Amended Temporary Restraining Order (bond). (ln)
October 7, 2021 CA State Bar status verified as active for Cara Burns not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc..(Miller, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. re #12 Business Entity Disclosure Statement Description of Exhibits (Miller, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. re #11 Certificate Description of Exhibits (Miller, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. re #10 Declaration Description of Exhibits (Miller, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SEIZURE ORDER SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Granting #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Cara R. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3461594) by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Certificate of Good Standing for the Central District of California)(Miller, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SEIZURE ORDER SHOULD NOT ISSUE)(Miller, Samuel)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SEIZURE ORDER SHOULD NOT ISSUE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants, Various John Does, Various Jane Does and XYZ Company, their true identities being unknown (collectively "Defendants") show cause before the Honorable Aleta A. Trauger, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 873 of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee, located at 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee, 37203 at 10:00a.m. on October 18, 2021. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responsive papers, if any, shall be filed with the Clerk of this Court and served upon the attorneys for Plaintiff by delivering copies to its counsel on or before October 11, 2021. Any reply shall be filed by the Plaintiff and served upon each appearing defendant or his/her counsel on or before October 14, 2021. Plaintiff is to provide copies of all other filed pleadings at the request of any identified defendant. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
October 5, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Hayley H. Baker admitted to this court. (kc)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits/attachments. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit/attachments with a brief description. (kc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Miller on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment)(Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Cara Burns filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Emily Holt filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. . (Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TRO Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Various Jane Does, Various John Does, and XYZ Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 04:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 (DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY FILER) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) Modified on 10/4/2021 (bs).
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Various Jane Does, Various John Does, XYZ Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503459887), filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - TM Report, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
October 4, 2021 CA State Bar status verified as active for Cara Burns not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Cara Burns: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/25/2021. (jm)
October 4, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel F. Miller admitted to this court. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Various John Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cara Burns
Represented By: Samuel F. Miller
Represented By: Hayley H. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?