Generation Changers Church v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Generation Changers Church
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00764
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by George Tolbert Lewis, III on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company (Lewis, George)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 is Denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/30/2021. (dt)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ryan A. Strain: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/21/2021. (dt)
November 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel J. Ripper and George Tolbert Lewis, III admitted to this court. (dt)
November 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ryan A. Strain not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Ripper, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Ripper, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Church Mutual Insurance Company.(Ripper, Daniel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed as to Church Mutual Insurance Company through the State of Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance served on 10/18/2021. (dt)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Erik D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/25/2021. (lh)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Erik D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3469706) by Generation Changers Church. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Peterson, Erik)
October 7, 2021 KY State Bar status verified as active for Erik D. Peterson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 6, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter admitted to this court. (dt)
October 6, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Erik D. Peterson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/27/2021. (dt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Church Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3460734), filed by Generation Changers Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Estimate 4/9/2020, #2 Exhibit B - Estimate 9/30/2020, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Generation Changers Church v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generation Changers Church
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Ripper
Represented By: George Tolbert Lewis, III
Represented By: Ryan A. Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?