Avantax Wealth Management, Inc. v. RHP Hotels, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Avantax Wealth Management, Inc. and H.D. Vest, Inc.
Defendant: RHP Hotels, LLC and Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc. doing business as Gaylord Opryland Resort & Convention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00810
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avantax Wealth Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parent Corporations)(Sanders, J.)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/26/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to RHP Hotels, LLC, Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc. (Service packet is at intake counter for counsel to pick up.) (kc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 1/10/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) Modified on 10/25/2021 (kc).
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
October 25, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Isaac Sanders, Jeffrey A. Zager, and William J. Harbison, II admitted to this court. (kc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 RECEIPT #34675063949 in the amount of $402 posted by Avantax Wealth Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (kc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RHP Hotels, LLC and Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675063949), filed by Avantax Wealth Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Opryland Contract, #2 Attachment - Cover Letter, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avantax Wealth Management, Inc. v. RHP Hotels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avantax Wealth Management, Inc.
Represented By: J. Isaac Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zager
Represented By: William J. Harbison, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. Vest, Inc.
Represented By: J. Isaac Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zager
Represented By: William J. Harbison, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHP Hotels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc. doing business as Gaylord Opryland Resort & Convention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?