DR Entertainment, LLC v. Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DR Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC and Ryan Upchurch
Case Number: 3:2021cv00817
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 2/8/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion to Continue Case Management Conference #12 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to February 8, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/18/2021.(ln)
December 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue 12/21 Case Management Conference by DR Entertainment, LLC. (Goldman, David)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by David J. Goldman (Goldman, David)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Ryan Upchurch. Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Ryan Upchurch. (Goldman, David)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/29/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC. Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/21/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DR Entertainment, LLC. (ln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC and Ryan Upchurch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3473824) filed by DR Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
October 27, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for David J. Goldman admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DR Entertainment, LLC v. Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: David J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Moon Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?