Castro v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Francis J. Castro
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00084
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to continue the initial case management conference. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to 4/28/2022, at 10:00 AM. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/8/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 8, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
April 7, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra)
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 4/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/25/2022. (dt)
March 24, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
March 23, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Paxton Roberts on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Roberts, Lauren)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 4/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/23/2022. (dt)
March 22, 2022 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Malone, Michael)
March 22, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Malone, Michael)
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Malone on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Malone, Michael)
March 20, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley and Melody I. McAnally admitted to this court. (dt)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melody I. McAnally on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (McAnally, Melody)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Hadley, Alexandra)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Hadley, Alexandra)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/11/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
February 10, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Robert Harlan and Keith D. Slocum admitted to this court. (dt)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3529713), filed by Francis J. Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MC Delinquent Letter Dated 8.13.2021, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs Proof of Payments 1.2021 through 1.2022, #3 Exhibit 3 - MC Posted Payments 1.7.2021 to 1.7.2022, #4 Exhibit 4 - MC July 20, 2021 Statement, #5 Exhibit 5 - MC August 18, 2021Statement, #6 Exhibit 6 - MCs September 20, 2021 Statement, #7 Exhibit 7 - MCs October 19, 2021 Statement, #8 Exhibit 8 - MCs November 18, 2021 Statement, #9 Exhibit 9 - MC's December 20, 2021 Statement, #10 Exhibit 10 - MCs January 19, 2022 Statement, #11 Exhibit 11 - MCs September 3, 2021, No Error Letter, #12 Exhibit 12 - MCs October 15, 2021, No Error Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - MCs Payment History 3.2020 Through October 2021, #14 Exhibit 14 - MCs Loan Modification, #15 Exhibit 15 - EQ Dispute Results, #16 Exhibit 16 - EX Dispute Results, #17 Exhibit 17 - Check for February 2022 and Difference, #18 Exhibit USAA Check, #19 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Castro
Represented By: J. Robert Harlan
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley
Represented By: Melody I. McAnally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?