Page v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sonya Lee Page
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2022cv00239
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney's Office on 6/6/2022 by Sonya Lee Page. (mg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 REVISED Summons and 285 Form Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to the U.S. Marshals for service. (mg) Modified on 5/9/2022 (mg).
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD, NOT COMPLETE***Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (mg) Modified on 5/9/2022 (mg).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Sonya Lee Page has filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this action (Doc. No. #5 ). The Court has reviewed Page's application and finds that in forma pauperis status is appropriate. Accordingly, the motion #2 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/7/2022. (mg) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (hb).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b), and the Local Rules of Court. Additionally, Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for decision. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/6/2022. (bs)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sonya Lee Page. (vh)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Sonya Lee Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
April 5, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for April Adams Carr admitted to this court. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Lee Page
Represented By: April Adams Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?