Burke v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patrick Allen Burke
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2022cv00414
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General on 06/13/2022 by Patrick Allen Burke. (George, Christopher)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office Regional Counsel Region VII on 06/13/2022 by Patrick Allen Burke. (George, Christopher)
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney Middle District TN on 06/13/2022 by Patrick Allen Burke. (George, Christopher)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 9, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher Mark George admitted to this court. (dt)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b), and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/8/2022. (ln)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3608471), filed by Patrick Allen Burke. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Allen Burke
Represented By: Christopher Mark George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?