Arbour v. Upchurch et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Arbour
Defendant: Ryan Upchurch, Thomas Toner, Holler Boy Records, LLC and Stonebaby Sounds, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00446
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Nicole Arbour. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
August 12, 2022 Filing 21 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stonebaby Sounds, LLC. (Peal, Robert)
August 12, 2022 Filing 20 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thomas Toner. (Peal, Robert)
August 12, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Lenihan on behalf of Stonebaby Sounds, LLC, Thomas Toner (Lenihan, Mark)
August 12, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Peal on behalf of Stonebaby Sounds, LLC, Thomas Toner (Peal, Robert)
August 12, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : The document is not signed. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 167-1, Section 8, electronically filed documents shall set forth the Filing User's name, address, telephone number and Board of Professional Responsibility registration number. The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/" or inserted facsimile signature. Counsel shall re-file the document. (ln)
August 12, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert A. Peal admitted to this court. (ln)
August 12, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark W. Lenihan admitted to this court. (ln)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 ****DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Nicole Arbour. (VanAusdall, Jacob) Modified on 8/12/2022 (ln).
July 21, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert A. Peal admitted to this court. (ln)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Arbour. Stonebaby Sounds, LLC waiver sent on 7/20/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Arbour. Thomas Toner waiver sent on 7/20/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Arbour. Holler Boy Records, LLC waiver sent on 6/17/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Correll on behalf of Holler Boy Records, LLC (Correll, Austin)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Sherwood on behalf of Holler Boy Records, LLC (Sherwood, Cynthia)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Nicole Arbour. Stonebaby Sounds, LLC served on 6/30/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Nicole Arbour. Thomas Toner served on 6/30/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 5, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia A. Sherwood and Austin M. Correll admitted to this court. (ln)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Correll on behalf of Ryan Upchurch (Correll, Austin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Sherwood on behalf of Ryan Upchurch (Sherwood, Cynthia)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Arbour. Ryan Upchurch waiver sent on 6/17/2022. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Holler Boy Records, LLC, Stonebaby Sounds, LLC, Thomas Toner, and Ryan Upchurch. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window. (ln)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/16/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holler Boy Records, LLC, Stonebaby Sounds, LLC, Thomas Toner, Ryan Upchurch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3612394) filed by Nicole Arbour. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
June 14, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob C. VanAusdall, Todd G. Cole admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbour v. Upchurch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Arbour
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Upchurch
Represented By: Austin M. Correll
Represented By: Cynthia A. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Toner
Represented By: Mark W. Lenihan
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holler Boy Records, LLC
Represented By: Austin M. Correll
Represented By: Cynthia A. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebaby Sounds, LLC
Represented By: Mark W. Lenihan
Represented By: Robert A. Peal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?