Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc. v. Putnam County Republican Party et al
Plaintiff: Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.
Defendant: Putnam County Republican Party and Tennessee Republican Party
Case Number: 3:2022cv00568
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No. #35 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/29/2022. (ad)
September 29, 2022 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint with Prejudice by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. (Christopher, Kevin)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #25 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Anna Whitacre to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/27/2022. (lh)
September 27, 2022 Filing 33 RECEIPT #34675066985 in the amount of $150 posted by Tennessee Republican Party re #25 Anna Whitacre's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
September 19, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to re #22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Verified Complaint filed by Tennessee Republican Party. (Mullen, Joshua)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Plaintiff Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc., notified the Court that the parties are currently engaging in settlement discussions and requested a continuance to the September 16, 2022 case management conference. Accordingly, the conference is CANCELLED. If the parties are unable to resolve all claims in this matter, the initial case management conference will proceed on October 3, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/3/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: A telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge is set on September 16, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall meet and confer before the conference and shall be prepared to address the setting of a schedule for any required briefing, discovery, and hearing related to Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/13/2022. (hb)
September 12, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Verified Complaint filed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. (Christopher, Kevin)
September 12, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to re #18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Putnam County Republican Party. (Johnson, Michael)
September 6, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. (Christopher, Kevin)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: On August 29, 2022, Defendant Tennessee Republican Party filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #22 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Chief Judge Crenshaw unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 30, 2022 GA State Bar status verified as active for Anna Marie T. Whitacre not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
August 30, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joshua A. Mullen admitted to this court. (mg)
August 29, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Anna Whitacre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Tennessee Republican Party. (Mullen, Joshua) Modified on 9/27/2022 (mg).
August 29, 2022 Filing 24 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennessee Republican Party. (Mullen, Joshua)
August 29, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Verified Complaint filed by Tennessee Republican Party . (Mullen, Joshua)
August 29, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Verified Complaint by Tennessee Republican Party. (Mullen, Joshua)
August 25, 2022 Filing 21 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Putnam County Republican Party. (Johnson, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: On August 22, 2022, Defendant Putnam County Republican Party filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 41(b). (Doc. No. #18 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Chief Judge Crenshaw unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/23/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 22, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Putnam County Republican Party . (Johnson, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Putnam County Republican Party. (Johnson, Michael)
August 15, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. Tennessee Republican Party served on 8/6/2022. (Christopher, Kevin)
August 10, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for John J. Griffin, Jr, Michael A. Johnson, and Casey R. Malloy admitted to this court . (jm)
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey R. Malloy on behalf of Putnam County Republican Party (Malloy, Casey)
August 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Johnson on behalf of Putnam County Republican Party (Johnson, Michael)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Griffin, Jr on behalf of Putnam County Republican Party (Griffin, John)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Chief Judge Crenshaw has referred this matter to the Magistrate Judge to address the setting of a schedule for any required briefing, discovery, and a hearing related to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. (Doc. No. #9 .) Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to confer with Defendants' counsel and to notify the Magistrate Judge's courtroom deputy of mutually convenient dates and times for a telephonic case management conference on this issue no later than seven days after Defendants have appeared in the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/8/2022. (jm)
August 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc. re #10 Amended Complaint,,, Plaintiff's Exhibits to its Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PCRP Executive Committee Members, #2 Exhibit IMPACT Group Photo on Social Media Facebook, #3 Exhibit Pipeline to Progress, #4 Exhibit IMPACT Logo, #5 Exhibit IMPACT Copyright Registration, #6 Exhibit Herald Citizen Article of IMPACT Group, #7 Exhibit Mayor Ricky Shelton Cookeville Proclamation, #8 Exhibit Domain Info. on DontPelosiPutnam.com, #9 Exhibit July 12, 2022 Article on DontPelosiPutnam, #10 Exhibit Impressionable Teens Article on DontPelosiPutnam, #11 Exhibit Abortion Article on DontPelosiPutnam, #12 Exhibit Billboard of DontPelosiPutnam, #13 Exhibit Billboard 2 of DontPelosiPutnam, #14 Exhibit IMPACT Responses on Facebook, #15 Exhibit Facebook Comments, #16 Exhibit Copyright Notice of IMPACT Graphics 7.3.22, #17 Exhibit DontPelosiPutnam Website, #18 Exhibit Cindy Schueman Facebook Post 7.16.22, #19 Exhibit PCRP Facebook Stats, #20 Exhibit Profile of Mayor of Cookeville, Ricky Shelton, #21 Exhibit Senator Paul Bailey with IMPACT - Facebook Post 9.23.20)(Christopher, Kevin)
August 5, 2022 Filing 11 Summons issued re #10 Amended Complaint as to Putnam County Republican Party and Tennessee Republican Party. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
August 5, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (jm)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment List of Exhibits to Amended Complaint, #3 Attachment Summons to Putnam County Republican Party, #4 Attachment Summons to Tennessee Republican Party, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Christopher, Kevin)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is referred to the Magistrate Judge to scheduling briefs, discovery and proposed dates for an injunctive hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/3/2022. (jm)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff's Exhibits to its Complaint (Christopher, Kevin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. (Christopher, Kevin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.. Putnam County Republican Party served on 8/1/2022. (Christopher, Kevin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Putnam County Republican Party and Tennessee Republican Party. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
August 2, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kevin Christopher admitted to this court. (jm)
August 2, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (jm)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Putnam County Republican Party and Tennessee Republican Party (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3638296), filed by Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Report of Copyright Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc. v. Putnam County Republican Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cookeville I.M.P.A.C.T., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Republican Party
Represented By: Casey R. Malloy
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Republican Party
Represented By: Anna Marie T. Whitacre
Represented By: Joshua A. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?