Hodge v. Permanent General Assurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Jill Hodge
Defendant: Permanent General Assurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00608
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Brigid)
September 29, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed by Jill Hodge. The Department of Commerce and Insurance was served on 9/15/2022 on behalf of Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (ad)
September 19, 2022 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Carpenter, Brigid)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Class Action Complaint. Permanent General Assurance Corporation answer due 10/12/2022. The unopposed motion also requests that the initial case management conference be rescheduled to a date after the answer is filed. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 19, 2022, to 1:30 p.m., Wednesday, November 16, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/13/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 13, 2022 Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/16/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (hb)
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order)(Carpenter, Brigid)
September 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Hicks on behalf of Permanent General Assurance Corporation (Hicks, John)
September 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid M. Carpenter on behalf of Permanent General Assurance Corporation (Carpenter, Brigid)
September 8, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
September 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Stranch, James)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 and #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Chris Gold and Scott Edelsberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/31/2022. (lh)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Scott Edelsberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3657730) by Jill Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
August 30, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Chris Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3657725) by Jill Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Jill Hodge. Permanent General Assurance Corporation served on 8/22/2022. (Stranch, James)
August 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Shamis on behalf of Jill Hodge (Shamis, Andrew)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/12/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Permanent General Assurance Corporation. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
August 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/19/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Permanent General Assurance Corporation (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3645247), filed by Jill Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - MVR11)(jm)
August 11, 2022 FL State Bar status verified as active for Scott Edelsberg and Chris Gold not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
August 11, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Scott Edelsberg, Chris Gold: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/1/2022. (jm)
August 11, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV; FL State Bar status verified as active for Andrew J. Shamis admitted to this court. (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Permanent General Assurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hodge
Represented By: Andrew J. Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permanent General Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: John S. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?