Doe #12 v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe #12
Defendant: William B. Lee and David B. Rausch
Case Number: 3:2022cv00712
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Due to a continuing civil jury trial, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for November 14, 2022 is RESET for Wednesday, November 16, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/08/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) Modified on 11/9/2022 (ds).
November 7, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Initial filed by John Doe #12. (Adams, Walter)
November 1, 2022 Filing 21 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch.(Jones, Miranda)
October 4, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #12. (Adams, Walter)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Answers due by 11/4/2022. Response to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 10/12/2022. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 28, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Smitherman Declaration)(Jones, Miranda)
September 20, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint by William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jones, Miranda)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall reassign this case from Magistrate Judge Holmes to Magistrate Judge Newbern, as she is assigned to related cases. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/19/2022. (kc)
September 16, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #12. David B. Rausch served on 9/14/2022. (Adams, Walter)
September 16, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe #12. William B. Lee served on 9/14/2022. (Adams, Walter)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 Sealed Document Declaration of Doe #12 (unredacted version) filed by John Doe #12. (Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Declaration of Doe #12 (unredacted version) by John Doe #12. (Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #12 . (Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Doe #12 (redacted version))(Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order filed by John Doe #12 . (Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order by John Doe #12. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Protective Order)(Adams, Walter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to William B. Lee, David B. Rausch. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 11/14/2022 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William B. Lee, David B. Rausch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3665937), filed by John Doe #12. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
September 13, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward M. Yarbrough, Jonathan P. Farmer, Walter Justin Adams admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe #12 v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #12
Represented By: Jonathan P. Farmer
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Represented By: Edward M. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Lee
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?