Lovett et al v. ARC Automotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Lovett and Timothy Miller
Defendant: ARC Automotive, Inc., General Motors, LLC, KIA Corporation and KIA America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00725
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: The motion #15 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case. The parties shall file a notice within five business days of the JPML's disposition of the consolidation motion. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 24, 2022 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KIA America, Inc.. (Bibb, J.)
October 24, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of KIA America, Inc. (Bibb, J.)
October 20, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case - Joint Motion of All Parties to Stay Case filed by ARC Automotive, Inc. . (Zeigler, Jessalyn)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case - Joint Motion of All Parties to Stay Case by ARC Automotive, Inc.. (Zeigler, Jessalyn)
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessalyn H. Zeigler on behalf of ARC Automotive, Inc. (Zeigler, Jessalyn)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Nimish Ramesh Desai, David Soskin Stellings, Katherine Irene McBride, Gabriel August Panek, Roland Karim Tellis, and David Brian Fernandes, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/19/2022. (lh)
October 14, 2022 CA State Bar status verified as active for Nimish R. Desai, Roland Tellis, David Fernandes not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 14, 2022 NY State Bar status verified as active for David S. Stellings, Katherine I. McBride, Gabriel A. Panek not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) Modified on 10/14/2022 (mg).
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney David Brian Fernandes, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684291) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
October 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Roland Karim Tellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684285) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Gabriel August Panek to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684272) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
October 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Katherine Irene McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684271) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney David Soskin Stellings to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684267) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Nimish Ramesh Desai to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number BTNMDC-3684251) by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Byrd, Kenneth)
September 22, 2022 NY State Bar status verified as active for David S. Stellings, Katherine I. McBride, and Gabriel A. Panek; CA State Bar status verified as active for Nimish R. Desai, Roland Tellis, and David Fernandes not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm)
September 22, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kenneth S. Byrd admitted to this court. (jm)
September 22, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David S. Stellings, Katherine I. McBride, Gabriel A. Panek, Nimish R. Desai, Roland Tellis, and David Fernandes: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/13/2022. (jm)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/17/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to ARC Automotive, Inc., General Motors, LLC, KIA America, Inc., KIA Corporation. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, Receipt number BTNMDC-3668355), filed by Elisabeth Lovett, Timothy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovett et al v. ARC Automotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Lovett
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Gabriel A. Panek
Represented By: Katherine I. McBride
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Nimish R. Desai
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Miller
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Gabriel A. Panek
Represented By: Katherine I. McBride
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Nimish R. Desai
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA America, Inc.
Represented By: J. Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?