United States of America v. $46,080.00 United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $46,080.00 United States Currency, $57,098.61 United States Currency, $36,040.96 United States Currency and $13,132.00 United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2022cv00820
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Civil Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The United States' request for leave to file the document under seal #2 is granted. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the Declaration of Keith Sutherland, FBI TFO, filed in support of the Verified Complaint In Rem, #3 shall be sealed. The document shall remain under seal pending further orders of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to $13,132.00 United States Currency, $36,040.96 United States Currency, $46,080.00 United States Currency, $57,098.61 United States Currency. (Service copy forwarded to US Attorney J. Matthew Blackburn via in-house mailing.) (kc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/14/2022) (kc).
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 14, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Matthew Blackburn admitted to this court. (kc)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Summons and Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (kc)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Sealed Document filed by United States of America. (kc)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(kc)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $13,132.00 United States Currency, $36,040.96 United States Currency, $46,080.00 United States Currency, $57,098.61 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Fee waived. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $46,080.00 United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Matthew Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $46,080.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $57,098.61 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $36,040.96 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,132.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?