Norman et al v. Oticon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ron Worth Norman and Barbara Ellen Norman
Defendant: ES Diagnostics, Inc., Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc., Jason William Cline, Gordon N. Stowe and Associates, Inc., John 1-5 Doe, E3 Diagnostics, Inc. and Donlen Trust
Case Number: 3:2022cv00827
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That the Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc. and ES Diagnostics, Inc. f/k/a Gordon N. Stowe and Associates, Inc., Donlen Trust, and John Doe Defendants 1-5 shall be dismissed without prejudice as to the re-filing of the same. E3 Diagnostics, Inc. f/k/a Gordon N. Stowe and Associates, Inc., Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc., John 1-5 Doe (Unknown Defendants) and Donlen Trust terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ln).
November 30, 2022 Defendants Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, ES Diagnostics, Inc. f/k/a Gordon N. Stowe and Associates, Inc., and John Doe Defendants 1-5 are terminated as parties per #15 Order of Dismissal. (ds) Modified on 11/30/2022 (ds).
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Jason William Cline, E3 Diagnostics, Inc..(Lackey, Raymond)
November 18, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Raymond D. Lackey admitted to this court. (ln)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by E3 Diagnostics, Inc.. (Lackey, Raymond)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond D. Lackey on behalf of Jason William Cline, E3 Diagnostics, Inc. (Lackey, Raymond)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for C. Michael Bee to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/14/2022. (lh)
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbara Ellen Norman (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Trammell, Michael)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Charles Michael Bee from the United States District Court for the Southern of West Virginia filed by Barbara Ellen Norman. (Trammell, Michael)
November 7, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ln)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney C. Michael Bee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3699659) by Barbara Ellen Norman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate)(Trammell, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Donlen Trust, E3 Diagnostics, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc., Jason William Cline, ES Diagnostics, Inc., Donlen Trust, E3 Diagnostics, Inc., and John Doe 1-5, filed by Barbara Ellen Norman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons E3, #2 Attachment Summons Donlen)(Trammell, Michael) Modified on 10/24/2022 (ln).
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Jason William Cline, ES Diagnostics, Inc., Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
October 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 3:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason William Cline, John 1-5 Doe, ES Diagnostics, Inc., Oticon, Inc., WDH USA, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3684781) filed by Ron Worth Norman, Barbara Ellen Norman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
October 14, 2022 WV State Bar status verified as active for C. Michael Bee not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
October 14, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL C. Michael Bee: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/4/2022. (ln)
October 14, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Chad Trammell admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman et al v. Oticon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ES Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oticon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDH USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason William Cline
Represented By: Raymond D. Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon N. Stowe and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-5 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E3 Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond D. Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donlen Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Worth Norman
Represented By: C. Michael Bee
Represented By: Michael Chad Trammell
Represented By: Charles Michael Bee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ellen Norman
Represented By: C. Michael Bee
Represented By: Michael Chad Trammell
Represented By: Charles Michael Bee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?