Holland et al v. Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joann Holland and Gary Holland
Defendant: Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00856
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Appraisal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Appraisal filed by Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company. (Stewart, Jonathan)
December 16, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Evans, Baker)
December 14, 2022 Filing 17 Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer of Defendant by Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company.(Stewart, Jonathan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company. (Stewart, Jonathan)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The motion #14 is GRANTED. By no later than December 19, 2022, Defendant shall file a response to the plaintiffs' motion to compel. Plaintiff may file a reply by January 9, 2023. The initial case management conference set on December 14, 2022 (Doc. No. #4 ), is CONTINUED to January 25, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/8/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 8, 2022 Reset Hearings: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 1/25/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' #10 Motion to Compel Appraisal by Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Consultation)(Stewart, Jonathan) Modified on 12/8/2022 (ln).
December 1, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 13 : Discovery is not filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(d)(1). This document is deleted from the docket. (ln)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(A) Initial Disclosures (Stewart, Jonathan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Consultation filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland re #10 MOTION to Compel Appraisal filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. (Scott, Clinton)
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Compel Appraisal filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Appraisal Demand Letter 5-6-22, #2 Exhibit 2. Appraisal Rejection Letter 9-28-22, #3 Exhibit 3. Excerpt The Law and Procedure of Insurance Appraisal Wilkofsky)(Scott, Clinton)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Appraisal by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. (Scott, Clinton)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Joint) filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. (Evans, Baker)
November 17, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Baker G. Evans admitted to this court. (ln)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Baker G. Evans on behalf of Gary Holland, Joann Holland (Evans, Baker)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Stewart on behalf of Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company (Stewart, Jonathan)
October 25, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan David Stewart admitted to this court. (ln)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/20/2022. (McWherter, J.)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
October 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3689219) filed by Gary Holland, Joann Holland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
October 20, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Clinton H. Scott, J. Brandon McWherter, Jonathan L. Bobbitt, William D. Buckley, III admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland et al v. Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Holland
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: William D. Buckley, III
Represented By: Baker G. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Holland
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: William D. Buckley, III
Represented By: Baker G. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan David Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?