Martin v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Martin
Defendant: John Doe, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company and Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00945
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2023. Discovery due by 11/21/2023. Motions due by 4/22/2024. A status conference shall be held telephonically on November 13, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Leslie Martin Notice to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Default (Higdon, Hunter)
January 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 1/13/2023. (Hearing lasted :10)(sm)
January 10, 2023 Filing 15 UNNAMED DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Jones, Christopher)
January 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company by Leslie Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Higdon, Hunter)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Initial Case Management Conference set for January 12, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby reset to January 13, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/10/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. (Higdon, Hunter)
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (Feeney, John)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company.(Feeney, John)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Leslie Martin. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/30/2022. (Higdon, Hunter)
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Leslie Martin. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company served on 11/29/2022. (Higdon, Hunter)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 Summons (along with Complaint #1 , Notice of Consent of the Parties #3 , Notice Regarding Business Entity Disclosure Statement #2 , and Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference #4 ) received on behalf of John Doe pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D). (mg)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to John Doe, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/12/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
November 22, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Hunter Alston Higdon admitted to this court. (ad)
November 22, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alisha M. Toll admitted to this court. (ad)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3710844), filed by Leslie Martin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Martin
Represented By: Alisha M. Toll
Represented By: Hunter Alston Higdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?