Avery et al v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The
Plaintiff: Keith Avery, Hailey Winstead and Whitney Winstead
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The doing business as Goodyear Commercial Tire and Service Centers
Case Number: 3:2022cv01000
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' Motion #18 is GRANTED to the extent that Goodyear's affirmative defenses included in Paragraph 8 of the defenses and affirmative defenses section of Goodyear's Answer are hereby stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/18/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 5, 2023 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Asserted by Defendant the Goodyear Rubber and Tire Company filed by Keith Avery, Hailey Winstead, Whitney Winstead . (Blair, Rebecca)
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Asserted by Defendant the Goodyear Rubber and Tire Company by Keith Avery, Hailey Winstead, Whitney Winstead. (Blair, Rebecca)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Christopher L. Rhoads to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/04/2023. (lh)
December 29, 2022 KY State Bar status verified as active for Christopher L. Rhoads not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
December 27, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Christopher L. Rhoads to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3731418) by Keith Avery, Hailey Winstead, Whitney Winstead. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing of Christopher L. Rhoads)(Blair, Rebecca)
December 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Keith Avery, Hailey Winstead, Whitney Winstead of Appearance of Christopher L. Rhoads (Blair, Rebecca)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Scott A. Richman and Tiffany M. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 12/20/2022. (lh)
December 16, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Tiffany M. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3727389) by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of T. Ward)(Chapski, Robert)
December 16, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Scott A. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3727375) by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of S. Richman)(Chapski, Robert)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On December 14, 2022, counsel filed a joint motion to continue the initial case management conference set on February 9, 2023. #9 . The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to February 22, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The.(Chapski, Robert)
December 15, 2022 Reset Hearing per Order #11 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 2/22/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Keith Avery. (Blair, Rebecca)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/9/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The re #4 Notice of Consent of the Parties CORRECTED Written Notice to Adverse Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Written Notice to Adverse Parties)(Chapski, Robert)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 2/9/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (Chapski, Robert)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent of the Parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Chapski, Robert)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
December 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 22C2307. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNMDC-3722099) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Filings, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
December 8, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Scott A. Richman, Tiffany M. Ward: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/29/2022. (kc)
December 8, 2022 FL State Bar status verified as active for Scott A. Richman, Tiffany M. Ward not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
December 8, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca Cothran Blair, Robert F. Chapski admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery et al v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Avery
Represented By: Rebecca Cothran Blair
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Winstead
Represented By: Rebecca Cothran Blair
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Winstead
Represented By: Rebecca Cothran Blair
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The doing business as Goodyear Commercial Tire and Service Centers
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Represented By: Scott A. Richman
Represented By: Tiffany M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?