Gannett GP Media, Inc. v. City Lifestyle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gannett GP Media, Inc.
Defendant: City Lifestyle, LLC, Lifestyle Publications, LLC and Does 1 through 3
Case Number: 3:2022cv01080
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2023. Discovery due by 10/9/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/27/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
February 27, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 2/27/2023. (Hearing lasted 00:20)(sd)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Campbell, L.)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. City Lifestyle, LLC answer due 3/9/2023; Lifestyle Publications, LLC answer due 3/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/8/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
February 8, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City Lifestyle, LLC, Lifestyle Publications, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 , #11 , and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Rory J. Radding, Benjamin Charkow, and Aleksandra Elzbieta Eklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/03/2023. (lh)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Aleksandra Elzbieta Eklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3751499) by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, L.)
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Benjamin Charkow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3751244) by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, L.)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Rory J. Radding to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3751219) by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, L.)
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. City Lifestyle, LLC served on 1/23/2023. (Campbell, L.)
January 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Gannett GP Media, Inc.. Lifestyle Publications, LLC served on 1/17/2023. (Campbell, L.)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 01/04/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to City Lifestyle, LLC, Lifestyle Publications, LLC. (Service pages to be picked up at intake window by counsel.) (kc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 2/27/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gannett GP Media, Inc. (kc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Lifestyle, LLC, Does 1 through 3, Lifestyle Publications, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3734064), filed by Gannett GP Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TM Registration, #2 Exhibit B Oct 24 Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Exhibit C Nov 16 Lifestyle Response Letter, #4 Exhibit D Nov 22 Gannett Reply Email, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
December 30, 2022 State Bar status verified as active for Rory Radding (NY), Benjamin Charkow (NY), Aleksandra E. Eklund (CA) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
December 30, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for William L. Harbison, L. Webb Campbell, II, John L. Farringer, IV admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannett GP Media, Inc. v. City Lifestyle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gannett GP Media, Inc.
Represented By: Aleksandra E. Eklund
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: L. Webb Campbell, II
Represented By: Rory Radding
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Lifestyle, LLC
Represented By: Jamie K. Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Publications, LLC
Represented By: Jamie K. Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?