Edmondson et al v. Travelers Insurance
Plaintiff: Deandre Edmondson and Delexia Edmondson
Defendant: Travelers Insurance
Case Number: 3:2023cv00137
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No. #18 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/28/2023. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (ln)
March 27, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Travelers Insurance. (Albritton, Barret)
March 24, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re DE #17 : The filing made at DE #17 is DISREGARDED. Counsel who signed this pleading shall re-file this document using his or her own CM/ECF filing credentials. Counsel should also include a Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
March 23, 2023 Filing 17 ****DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE.**** STIPULATION of Dismissal by Travelers Insurance. (Albritton, Barret) Modified on 3/24/2023 (ln).
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Kevin P. Kelly and Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/13/2023. (lh)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant's counsel shall initiate the settlement effort and shall, by no later than by April 10, 2023, file a case resolution status report, after having discussed the status report with Plaintiffs in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/10/2023. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 10, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Insurance re #12 MOTION for attorney Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Albritton, Barret)
March 10, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Insurance re #11 MOTION for attorney Kevin P. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Albritton, Barret)
March 10, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 , #12 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificates of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for these documents. (Please do not re-file the motions.) (ln)
March 10, 2023 GA State Bar status verified as active for Kevin Patrick (Spilman) Kelly not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 10, 2023 GA State Bar status verified as active for Karen Karabinos not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 9, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3779267) by Travelers Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Albritton, Barret)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Kevin P. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3779261) by Travelers Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Albritton, Barret)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/2023; Discovery due by 6/23/2023; and Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/8/2023. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(c)(1), this case is exempt from mandatory customized case management. By a separate order entered at the appropriate time, the Court will enter a scheduling order setting out deadlines for the progression of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/6/2023. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barret Shane Albritton (Albritton, Barret)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Accordingly, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/27/2023. (xc:Pro se parties by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Travelers Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Business Entity Disc. contd.)(Albritton, Barret)
February 21, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#5 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for this document. (ln)
February 20, 2023 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Travelers Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Business Entity Disc. contd.)(Albritton, Barret)
February 16, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Barret Shane Albritton admitted to this court. (ln)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
February 15, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Insurance. (ln)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FORM filed by Travelers Insurance. (ln)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Insurance from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 23-C-104. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ATNMDC-3763847) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
February 15, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You DO NOT have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (ln)
February 15, 2023 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ln)
February 15, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmondson et al v. Travelers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delexia Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance
Represented By: Barret Shane Albritton
Represented By: Karen Karabinos
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?