Business For Good, LLC et al v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Business For Good, LLC doing business as California Closets of Tennessee and Schusterman Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv00200
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin N. England on behalf of Business For Good, LLC, Schusterman Enterprises, LLC (England, Erin)
April 27, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Baker G. Evans admitted to this court. (kc)
April 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Baker G. Evans on behalf of Business For Good, LLC, Schusterman Enterprises, LLC (Evans, Baker)
April 24, 2023 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Kemper, W.)
April 24, 2023 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Kemper, W.)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: MOTION #11 GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to May 31, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/14/2023. (kc)
April 14, 2023 Reset Hearing per Order #12 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 5/31/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Business For Good, LLC, Schusterman Enterprises, LLC. (Scott, Clinton)
April 5, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from TN Dept of Commerce and Insurance re service on behalf of Hartford Underwriters Ins. Co.; served on 3/17/2023. (kc)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
March 7, 2023 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Schusterman Enterprises, LLC. (McWherter, J.)
March 7, 2023 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Business For Good, LLC. (McWherter, J.)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 5/4/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
March 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
March 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
March 7, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The Business Entity Disclosure Statement has two businesses listed. Each business shall file its own Business Entity Disclosure Statement. Counsel shall file a separate statement for each company within 10 days. (kc)
March 7, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter, Jonathan L. Bobbitt, Clinton H. Scott admitted to this court. (kc)
March 6, 2023 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Business For Good, LLC, Schusterman Enterprises, LLC. (kc) Modified on 3/7/2023 (kc).
March 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 3776107), filed by Schusterman Enterprises, LLC, Business For Good, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy Change, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Business For Good, LLC et al v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business For Good, LLC doing business as California Closets of Tennessee
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Baker G. Evans
Represented By: Erin N. England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schusterman Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: Baker G. Evans
Represented By: Erin N. England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Douglas Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?