Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. GSP Supply Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. and V. Alexander & Co., Inc.
Defendant: GSP Supply Holdings, LLC, Curtis Turner and Jeffrey Moore
Case Number: 3:2023cv00208
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc..(Clemons, James)
April 28, 2023 Filing 17 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Curtis Turner. (Stone, Jarrod)
April 28, 2023 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GSP Supply Holdings, LLC. (Stone, Jarrod)
April 26, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jarrod W. Stone, Cole G. West admitted to this court. (ad)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Brendan Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/25/2023. (lh)
April 24, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. by Curtis Turner, GSP Supply Holdings, LLC.(Stone, Jarrod)
April 24, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Brendan Collins from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia of D.C. filed by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
April 18, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ad)
April 13, 2023 DC State Bar status verified as active for Brendan Collins not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
April 12, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Brendan Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number BTNMDC-3800780) by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing)(Clemons, James)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Curtis Turner on 03/24/23, filed by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
April 5, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on GSP Supply Holdings, LLC on 03/24/23, filed by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Clemons, James)
March 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. Notice of Exhibits Filed (Clemons, James)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/9/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
March 9, 2023 Filing 7 Summons issued as to GSP Supply Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Moore, Curtis Turner. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
March 9, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ad)
March 9, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Michael Clemons, John R. Clemmons admitted to this court. (ad)
March 9, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brendan Collins: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/30/2023. (ad)
March 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/9/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by V. Alexander & Co., Inc. (ad)
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (ad) Modified on 3/8/2023 (ad).
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
March 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GSP Supply Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Moore, Curtis Turner (Filing fee $402, Receipt number BTNMDC-3778132), filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc., V. Alexander & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - A, #3 Exhibit - B, #4 Exhibit - C, #5 Exhibit - D, #6 Exhibit - E, #7 Exhibit - F, #8 Exhibit - G)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. GSP Supply Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Alexander & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSP Supply Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Cole G. West
Represented By: Jarrod W. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Turner
Represented By: Jarrod W. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?