Hunt v. Southern Baptist Convention et al
Plaintiff: Johnny M. Hunt
Defendant: Southern Baptist Convention, Guidepost Solutions LLC and Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention
Case Number: 3:2023cv00243
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Filing 33 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Bundren, R.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support of #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State Claims for Relief filed by Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention . (Bundren, R.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State Claims for Relief by Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Bundren, R.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Southern Baptist Convention . (Pietsch, Matthew)
May 4, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Southern Baptist Convention. (Pietsch, Matthew)
May 4, 2023 Filing 28 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Guidepost Solutions LLC. (Jacobson, John)
May 4, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Guidepost Solutions LLC . (Jacobson, John)
May 4, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Anthony M. Collura filed by Guidepost Solutions LLC re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Jacobson, John)
May 4, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Guidepost Solutions LLC. (Jacobson, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 24 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by E. Todd Presnell on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention (Presnell, E.)
April 18, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#23 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include ALL Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for this document. (ln)
April 18, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Todd Presnell admitted to this court. (ln)
April 17, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Todd Presnell on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention (Presnell, E.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #7 , #8 , #9 , #14 , #15 , and #16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Robert D. MacGill, Scott E. Murray, Patrick Sanders, Gene R. Besen, Steven G. Mintz, and Terence W. McCormick to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/04/2023. (lh)
April 4, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew C. Pietsch admitted to this court. (ln)
April 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pietsch on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Pietsch, Matthew)
April 3, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Marchetti, Louis) Modified on 4/4/2023 (ln).
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: MOTION #18 for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #1 GRANTED. Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention's answer due 5/4/2023; Guidepost Solutions LLC's answer due 5/4/2023; Southern Baptist Convention's answer due 5/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/31/2023. (ln)
March 30, 2023 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Other Appropriate Motion in Relation to Plaintiff's Complaint by Johnny M. Hunt. (Goldstein, Andrew) Modified event type on 3/31/2023 (ln).
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Marchetti, Louis)
March 29, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Terence W. McCormick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3792447) by Guidepost Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Klein, Katharine)
March 29, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Steven G. Mintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3792443) by Guidepost Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Klein, Katharine)
March 29, 2023 NY State Bar status verified as active for Steven G. Mintz, Terence William McCormick not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 29, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re DE #17 : Pursuant to LR83.01, any attorney representing a party in any civil action shall use their individual ECF account to file a separate Notice of Appearance with the Clerk of the Court to ensure appearance on the docket. (ln)
March 29, 2023 TX State Bar status verified as active for Gene Ross Besen not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 29, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for this document. (ln)
March 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr admitted to this court. (ln)
March 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Brandon Bundren, Scarlett Singleton Nokes admitted to this court. (ln)
March 28, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Gene R. Besen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3791500) by Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Besen Certificate of Good Standing (U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas))(Bundren, R.)
March 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scarlett Singleton Nokes on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention (Nokes, Scarlett)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Brandon Bundren on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention (Bundren, R.)
March 24, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for John R. Jacobson, Katharine R. Klein admitted to this court. (ln)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine R. Klein on behalf of Guidepost Solutions LLC (Klein, Katharine)
March 23, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Jacobson on behalf of Guidepost Solutions LLC (Jacobson, John)
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Patrick Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3788624) by Johnny M. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of Patrick Sanders (S.D. Ind.))(Goldstein, Andrew)
March 23, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Scott E. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3788608) by Johnny M. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of Scott E. Murray (S.D. Ind.))(Goldstein, Andrew)
March 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Robert D. MacGill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3788601) by Johnny M. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of Robert D. MacGill (S.D. Ind.))(Goldstein, Andrew)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/20/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
March 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Guidepost Solutions LLC, Southern Baptist Convention. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
March 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/23/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
March 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Guidepost Solutions LLC, Southern Baptist Convention (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3784703) filed by Johnny M. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Engagement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Report of the Independent Investigation: The Southern Baptist Convention Executive Committee's Responses to Sexual Abuse Allegations and Audit of the Procedures and Actions of the Credentials Committee, #3 Exhibit C - 12.05.2022 Bart Barber Tweet, #4 Exhibit D - 02.01.2022 SBC Credentials Committee Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Demand Letter to SBC and EC of the SBC, #6 Exhibit F - Demand Letter to Guidepost Solutions LLC, #7 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
March 17, 2023 IN State Bar status verified as active for Robert D. MacGill, Scott E. Murray, Patrick J. Sanders not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
March 17, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert D. MacGill, Scott E. Murray, Patrick J. Sanders: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/7/2023. (ln)
March 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Todd G. Cole, Andrew P. Goldstein admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Southern Baptist Convention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny M. Hunt
Represented By: Andrew P. Goldstein
Represented By: Patrick J. Sanders
Represented By: Robert D. MacGill
Represented By: Scott E. Murray
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Pietsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidepost Solutions LLC
Represented By: Katharine R. Klein
Represented By: Steven G. Mintz
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By: E. Todd Presnell
Represented By: Gene Ross Besen
Represented By: R. Brandon Bundren
Represented By: Scarlett Singleton Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?