King et al. v. Crane Nuclear, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: William King, Jr., Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund and Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund
Defendant: Crane Nuclear, Inc. and Chris Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2023cv00273
Filed: March 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Crane Nuclear, Inc., Chris Mitchell re Annotation - Deficiency Notice, #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Chris Mitchell, Crane Nuclear, Inc.. (Belchic, Sarah)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. #11 ) is GRANTED. The defendants may have an extension until June 12, 2023 within which to respond to the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for June 12, 2023 is hereby RESET for Monday, June 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/8/2023. (ln)
May 8, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document that includes all counsel. (ln)
May 8, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sarah V. Belchic admitted to this court. (ln)
May 8, 2023 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 6/26/2023 at 2:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
May 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Crane Nuclear, Inc., Chris Mitchell. (Belchic, Sarah)
May 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah V. Belchic on behalf of All Defendants (Belchic, Sarah)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Frank James re: Chris Mitchell Non-Military, Age and Competency filed by William King, Jr, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund re: #8 Affidavit of Service,. (Jennings, R.)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Notice of Initial Case Management Conference served on Chris Mitchell on 04/19/2023, filed by William King, Jr, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund. (Jennings, R.)
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund, William King, Jr, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund. Crane Nuclear, Inc. served on 4/10/2023. (Jennings, R.)
April 6, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Karla M. Campbell admitted to this court. (ln)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M. Campbell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Campbell, Karla)
March 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2023 at 2:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
March 28, 2023 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Crane Nuclear, Inc., Chris Mitchell. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window between 8:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m. (ln)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
March 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
March 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crane Nuclear, Inc., Chris Mitchell (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3790921) filed by Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund, William King, Jr, Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trust Agreement-Health and Welfare Fund, #2 Exhibit B - Trust Agreement-Pension Fund, #3 Exhibit C - PMMA [Project Maintenance and Modification Agreement Package], #4 Exhibit D - TVA Contract Number 16051, #5 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
March 28, 2023 State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings (TN), Michael C Iadevaia (NY) admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al. v. Crane Nuclear, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William King, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C Iadevaia
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael C Iadevaia
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers & Steamfitters Local No. 43 Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael C Iadevaia
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Nuclear, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah V. Belchic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah V. Belchic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?