Lea v. Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Corey Lea
Defendant: Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack and United States Department of Agriculture, The
Case Number: 3:2023cv00340
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Supplement TRO and Set Hearing by Corey Lea. (ln)
May 17, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Corey Lea. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -Proposed Order)(ad)
May 17, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Corey Lea. (ad)
May 12, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Corey Lea. Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack served on 4/19/2023. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (kc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION Requesting Supplemental Declaratory Judgment for Additional Relief Pursuant FRCP 57 by Corey Lea. (kc)
May 8, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corey Lea. (kc)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Set Hearing by Corey Lea. (kc)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion #7 to strike and replace his previously filed motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED. To the extent that what Plaintiff seeks is to file a new motion for a preliminary injunction, the Clerk is directed to file the proposed "motion for a preliminary injunction and set hearing" and supporting memorandum of law that are attached by Plaintiff to his motion to strike and are presently found on the docket at Docket Entry Nos. 7-1 through 7-3. The expedited motion to compel #10 is DENIED as to the requested for expedited relief but will remain docketed as a pending motion and will be considered at an appropriate time after Defendants have been served with process and afforded an opportunity to respond to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/8/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 EXPEDITED MOTION to Compel by Corey Lea. (kc)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Henry Leventis on 4/18/2023. (kc)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Merrick Garland on 4/20/2023. (kc)
April 18, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike and Replace [DN 2] re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Corey Lea. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Set Hearing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2023: #3 Attachment Memorandum of Law In Support of Preliminary Injunction) (kc).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE: The court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the plaintiff's request for a TRO #2 . The court's ruling does not preclude the plaintiff from filing a properly-supported, procedurally-compliant motion under Rule 65. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/15/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack, United States Department of Agriculture, The, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service packet returned to pro se plaintiff at intake counter. (kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Corey Lea. (kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Corey Lea. (kc)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack, United States Department of Agriculture, The (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675069030), filed by Corey Lea. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Receipt)(kc)
April 13, 2023 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lea v. Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Agriculture, Thomas Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?