Tomlin v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tomlin
Defendant: Teddy Wright and Venture Transport, LLC
Interested Party: TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2023cv00437
Filed: May 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jennifer Tomlin. (Sitgreaves, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. No. #14 ), seeking dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against the unnamed Defendant, Trustgard Insurance Company. In the stipulation, the parties cite to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, but that rule applies to the dismissal of actions, not parties. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and the parties stipulation, the Court DISMISSES unnamed Defendant Trustgard Insurance Company without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 06/26/23. (ad)
June 23, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to the UM Trustgard Insurance Company Only by TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sprader, Paul)
June 15, 2023 Filing 13 Summons issued as to Teddy Wright. Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
June 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Teddy Wright. (Sitgreaves, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Venture Transport, LLC.(White, Mary Beth)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The REFERRAL to the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. #5 ) is hereby RESCINDED. Pursuant to 16.01, the initial case management conference before Judge Campbell is scheduled in Courtroom 6D, Fred D. Thompson U.S. Courthouse, 719 Church Street, Nashville, Tennessee, on July 10, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/26/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Sprader on behalf of TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Sprader, Paul)
May 22, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ln)
May 22, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul L. Sprader admitted to this court. (ln)
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Sprader on behalf of TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Sprader, Paul)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Complaint #1 -1. Venture Transport, LLC answer due by 6/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/8/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
May 8, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (ln)
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Venture Transport, LLC. (White, Mary Beth)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/3/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
May 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 3, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth N. Sitgreaves, Mary Beth White admitted to this court. (ln)
May 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Venture Transport, LLC from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 23C663. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ATNMDC-3813005.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlin v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tomlin
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Sitgreaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddy Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Transport, LLC
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul L. Sprader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?