Sills et al v. Southern Baptist Convention et al
Plaintiff: Michael David Sills and Mary Sills
Defendant: Southern Baptist Convention, Dr. Ed Litton, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Jennifer Lyell, Eric Geiger, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Bart Barber, Willie McLaurin, Rolland Slade, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary, Dr. R. Albert Mohler, Solutionpoint International, Inc. a corporation, individually and doing business as Guidepoint Solutions, Guidepoint Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc. a corporation, individually and d/b/a GUIDEPOST SOLUTIONS doing business as Guidepost Solutions and Guidepost Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00478
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/7/2023. (af)
July 6, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Mangelsdorf, Jr on behalf of Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention (Mangelsdorf, Richard)
July 5, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ryan P. Loofbourrow admitted to this court. (mg)
July 3, 2023 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Willie McLaurin, Rolland Slade. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 3, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Loofbourrow on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Willie McLaurin, Rolland Slade (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 and #65 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for R. Bruce Barze, Jr. and J. Graham Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/15/2023. (lh)
June 16, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brigid M. Carpenter admitted to this court. (mg)
June 15, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid M. Carpenter on behalf of Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Willie McLaurin, Rolland Slade (Carpenter, Brigid)
June 15, 2023 AL State Bar status verified as active for J. Graham Gilmore not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
June 15, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Catherine M. Newman admitted to this court. (mg)
June 14, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION for attorney J. Graham Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3847327) by Eric Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Northern District of AL)(Newman, Catherine)
June 14, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for attorney R. Bruce Barze, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3847299) by Eric Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Northern District of AL)(Newman, Catherine)
June 14, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. Newman on behalf of Eric Geiger (Newman, Catherine)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 and #61 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Thomas Travis and Byron Leet to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/14/2023. (lh)
June 14, 2023 KY State Bar status verified as active for Thomas E. Travis, Byron E. Leet not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
June 13, 2023 Filing 61 Supplemental MOTION for attorney Byron Leet to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3846239) by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Bradshaw, James)
June 13, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for attorney Thomas E. Travis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3846235) by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Bradshaw, James)
June 13, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#59 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (lh)
June 9, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION for attorney Byron Leet to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3843849) by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Bradshaw, James)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Dr. R. Albert Mohler answer due 7/12/2023; The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary answer due 7/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 06/09/23. (ad)
June 7, 2023 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Bradshaw, James)
June 7, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [54-2], [55-2]: The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (mg)
June 7, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#54 , #55 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (mg)
June 7, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for James C. Bradshaw, III admitted to this court. (mg)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Motion #52 Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/6/2023. (af)
June 6, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for attorney Byron Leet to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3840980) by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Bradshaw, James)
June 6, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION for attorney Thomas E. Travis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3840964) by Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Bradshaw, James)
June 6, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Bradshaw, III on behalf of Dr. R. Albert Mohler, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary (Bradshaw, James)
June 5, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response by Dr. Ed Litton, Bart Barber and by Southern Baptist Convention. (Pietsch, Matthew)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: MOTION #50 GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/5/2023. (af)
June 2, 2023 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Jennifer Lyell. (Elbert, Philip)
June 2, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kimberly M. Ingram admitted to this court. (ad)
June 2, 2023 AL State Bar status verified as active for R. Bruce Barze not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ad)
June 2, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for George H. Cate, III admitted to this court. (ad)
June 2, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL R. Bruce Barze: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/23/2023. (ad)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: MOTION #47 GRANTED. Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention answer due 7/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 06/01/23. (ad)
June 1, 2023 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Eric Geiger waiver sent on 6/1/2023. (Barrett, John (Don))
May 31, 2023 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Cate, George)
May 31, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M. Ingram on behalf of Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention (Ingram, Kimberly)
May 31, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by George H. Cate, III on behalf of Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention (Cate, George)
May 31, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ronald G. Harris admitted to this court. (ad)
May 31, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr admitted to this court. (ad)
May 31, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Olivia Rose Arboneaux, Philip N. Elbert admitted to this court. (ad)
May 31, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew C. Pietsch admitted to this court. (ad)
May 30, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pietsch on behalf of Bart Barber (Pietsch, Matthew)
May 30, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pietsch on behalf of Dr. Ed Litton (Pietsch, Matthew)
May 30, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pietsch on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Pietsch, Matthew)
May 30, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Dr. Ed Litton (Marchetti, Louis)
May 30, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Bart Barber (Marchetti, Louis)
May 30, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Dr. Ed Litton (Marchetti, Louis)
May 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Bart Barber (Marchetti, Louis)
May 30, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Marchetti, Louis)
May 30, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr on behalf of Southern Baptist Convention (Marchetti, Louis)
May 25, 2023 Filing 35 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Willie McLaurin served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 34 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Southern Baptist Convention served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 33 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Solutionpoint International, Inc. served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 32 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary served on 5/23/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Rolland Slade served on 5/15/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 30 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Jennifer Lyell served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 28 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Guidepost Solutions, LLC served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention served on 5/16/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Dr. R. Albert Mohler served on 5/23/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS returned executed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. Bart Barber served on 5/19/2023. (Barrett, John)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #16 and #17 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Steven G. Mintz and Terence W. McCormick to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/25/2023. (lh)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #7 , #8 , and #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Shannon M. McNulty, John W. ("Don") Barrett, and Katherine B. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/24/2023. (lh)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE***ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 05/24/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) Modified on 5/24/2023 (ad).
May 24, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Rose Arboneaux on behalf of Jennifer Lyell (Arboneaux, Olivia)
May 24, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip N. Elbert on behalf of Jennifer Lyell (Elbert, Philip)
May 24, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Harris on behalf of Jennifer Lyell (Harris, Ronald)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: MOTION #15 GRANTED. Guidepost Solutions, LLC answer due 7/12/2023; Solutionpoint International, Inc. answer due 7/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 05/24/23. (ad)
May 24, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for John R. Jacobson, Katharine R. Klein admitted to this court. (ad)
May 24, 2023 NY State Bar status verified as active for Steven G. Mintz not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
May 24, 2023 NY State Bar status verified as active for Terence William McCormick not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
May 23, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Terence W. McCormick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3831073) by Guidepost Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Klein, Katharine)
May 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Steven G. Mintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3831050) by Guidepost Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Klein, Katharine)
May 23, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Guidepost Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc.. (Klein, Katharine) Modified on 5/23/2023 (ad).
May 23, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine R. Klein on behalf of Guidepost Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc. (Klein, Katharine) Modified on 5/23/2023 (ad).
May 23, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Jacobson on behalf of Guidepost Solutions, LLC, Solutionpoint International, Inc. (Jacobson, John) Modified on 5/23/2023 (ad).
May 22, 2023 Filing 12 RECEIPT #34675069383 in the amount of $300.00 posted by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine B. Riley, #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John W. ("Don") Barrett. (ln)
May 18, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 of Attorney Shannon Marie McNulty from the United States District Court for the Northern of Illinois filed by. (ad)
May 17, 2023 Filing 10 RECEIPT #34675069359 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills re #7 Shannon McNulty Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (ad)
May 17, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ad)
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Katherine B. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Service List)(ad)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney John W. ("Don") Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Service List)(ad)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Shannon M. McNulty to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -Certificate of Good Standing)(ad) Modified on 5/17/2023 (ad).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 05/15/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
May 12, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Bart Barber, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Eric Geiger, Guidepoint Solutions, LLC, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Dr. Harry E. Litton, Jennifer Lyell, Willie McLaurin, Dr. R. Albert Mohler, Rolland Slade, Solutionpoint International, Inc., Southern Baptist Convention, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
May 12, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
May 12, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gary E. Brewer admitted to this court. (ad)
May 12, 2023 IL State Bar status verified as active for Shannon M. McNulty not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
May 12, 2023 MS State Bar status verified as active for Don Barrett not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
May 12, 2023 MS State Bar status verified as active for Katherine Barrett Riley not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
May 12, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shannon M. McNulty, Don Barrett, Katherine Barrett Riley: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/2/2023. (ad)
May 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
May 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
May 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bart Barber, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Eric Geiger, Guidepoint Solutions, LLC, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Dr. Ed Litton, Jennifer Lyell, Willie McLaurin, Dr. R. Albert Mohler, Rolland Slade, Solutionpoint International, Inc., Southern Baptist Convention, The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3823193), filed by Mary Sills, Michael David Sills. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - A)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sills et al v. Southern Baptist Convention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael David Sills
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gary E. Brewer
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Shannon M. McNulty
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sills
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: Gary E. Brewer
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Shannon M. McNulty
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Pietsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ed Litton
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Pietsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By: George H. Cate, III
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Represented By: Richard C. Mangelsdorf, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lyell
Represented By: Philip N. Elbert
Represented By: Ronald G. Harris
Represented By: Olivia Rose Arboneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Geiger
Represented By: Catherine M. Newman
Represented By: J. Graham Gilmore
Represented By: R. Bruce Barze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Barber
Represented By: Matthew C. Pietsch
Represented By: Louis Gino Marchetti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie McLaurin
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolland Slade
Represented By: Brigid M. Carpenter
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southern Baptist Theological Seminary
Represented By: Byron E. Leet
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw, III
Represented By: Thomas E. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. R. Albert Mohler
Represented By: Byron E. Leet
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw, III
Represented By: Thomas E. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutionpoint International, Inc. a corporation, individually and doing business as Guidepoint Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidepoint Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutionpoint International, Inc. a corporation, individually and d/b/a GUIDEPOST SOLUTIONS doing business as Guidepost Solutions
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: Katharine R. Klein
Represented By: Steven G. Mintz
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidepost Solutions, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: Katharine R. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?