P H S Enterprises, Inc. v. Guardados, LLC et al
Plaintiff: P H S Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Independent Fruit and Produce Company
Defendant: Guardados, LLC, Agustin Guardado and Agustin Guardado, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00492
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE by P H S Enterprises, Inc. re #17 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Amended Notice of Service (Stokes, Craig)
July 10, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Exhibits; Transmittal Letter and Order of May 26, 2023 served on Agustin Guardado on 06/27/2023, filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. (Stokes, Craig)
July 10, 2023 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Exhibits; Transmittal Letter and Order of May 26, 2023 served on Guardados, LLC on 6/27/2023, filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. (Stokes, Craig)
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. Agustin Guardado, Jr served on 6/27/2023. (Stokes, Craig)
July 10, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. Agustin Guardado served on 6/27/2023. (Stokes, Craig)
July 10, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. Guardados, LLC served on 6/27/2023. (Stokes, Craig)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court will consider Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. No. #11 ) once Plaintiff files a declaration or affidavit of the process server that explains who was served with what, when and how. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/7/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
July 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by P H S Enterprises, Inc. re #17 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Order)(Stokes, Craig)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order. (Doc. No. #11 , "Motion"). Defendants shall have until 12:00 p.m. on July 3, 2023, to file a response in opposition to the Motion. Plaintiff shall serve this Order to Defendants by appropriate means. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/29/2023. (kc)
June 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by P H S Enterprises, Inc. re #15 Order,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Service of Order related to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Stokes, Craig)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Thus, in order for the Motion #11 to be adjudicated, Plaintiff must either (i) give notice to Defendants regarding the Motion and establish the giving of such notice to the Court's satisfaction; or (ii) provide additional information sufficient to satisfy the Court that, its current impressions notwithstanding, the above-referenced requirements for issuance of an ex parte temporary restraining order without notice are indeed satisfied in this case. The Court will defer ruling on the Motion until one or the other of these events takes place. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/26/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
May 24, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction (Why Notice Should Not Be Required Under Rule 65(b)) by Craig Alan Stokes on behalf of P H S Enterprises, Inc. (Stokes, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Plaintiff's Representative in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc. re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction. (Stokes, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Guardados LLC's Online PACA Record)(Stokes, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Craig Alan Stokes (Stokes, Craig)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agustin Guardado, Jr, Agustin Guardado, Guardados, LLC, filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Personal Guaranty)(Stokes, Craig)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/17/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Agustin Guardado, Jr, Agustin Guardado, Guardados, LLC. Service packet placed at intake window for counsel to pick up. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/4/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Stokes on behalf of P H S Enterprises, Inc. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc. (kc)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agustin Guardado, Jr, Agustin Guardado, Guardados, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3825456), filed by P H S Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Open Invoices, #2 Exhibit B Individual Personal Guaranty, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
May 16, 2023 TX State Bar status verified as active for Craig Alan Stokes admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P H S Enterprises, Inc. v. Guardados, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P H S Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Independent Fruit and Produce Company
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardados, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Guardado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Guardado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?