Silvers et al v. HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Silvers and Richard Marous
Defendant: HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Gregory Crossman, Marissa Aragon, Abby Rubenfeld, Peter Sandstrom, Greg Marcisz, Laura Delapaz, Joshua Tuttle-Maceina, Andrea Abramovic, Zita Bowers, Michon Coats, Jonee Coleman, Suzanne Wallace, Ebony Hayes, Janna Nelson, B.W., A.B., J.W., Linda Simon, Gabriel Vater, Mary Del Vecchio, Alana Metcalf, Arthur Dekenipp, Angeline Hudson, Kelsey Hinds, Brittany Bonecutter, Cynthia Benbow, Scott Dry, Ross Harada, Danielle Hunter, Tina Martinez, Kaley Palmi, Brian Phan, Brooke Wallace Schulz, Kathleen Scott, Meredith Spies, Rebecca Thomas, Marcus Glascock, M.R. and D.S., Sandra Prosser Hahn, Jennifer Sperling, Leslie Sperling, Rasheed Abdul-Latif and Sarah Martin
Case Number: 3:2023cv00684
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
3 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Jennifer Sperling, Leslie Sperling re #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Gilreath, Sidney)
September 8, 2023 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Jennifer Sperling, Leslie Sperling re #44 Amended Complaint (Gilreath, Sidney)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#44 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#45 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
September 7, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Jennifer Sperling, Leslie Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CMST Resume, #2 Exhibit Pachman Resume, #3 Exhibit SG Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit Proposed Billing Protocol)(Gilreath, Sidney)
September 7, 2023 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Sperling, Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Leslie Sperling.(Gilreath, Sidney)
September 7, 2023 Filing 43 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Phillips, W.)
September 7, 2023 DC State Bar status verified as active for Andrew B. Clubok, Susan E. Engel not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
September 7, 2023 CA State Bar status verified as active for Melanie M. Blunschi, Elizabeth L. Deeley not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
September 6, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Susan E. Engel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3905547) by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Susan E. Engel, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, W.)
September 6, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for attorney Andrew B. Clubok to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3905530) by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Andrew B. Clubok, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, W.)
September 6, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth L. Deeley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3905450) by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Elizabeth L. Deeley, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, W.)
September 6, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION for attorney Melanie M. Blunschi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3905414) by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, W.)
September 6, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Marissa Alter-Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3905395) by HCA Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Marissa Alter-Nelson, #2 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, W.)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: I hereby recuse myself in this case. The file shall be returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another Judge. Because all District Judges in the Middle District of Tennessee have recused in this matter, a Judge from outside this District will be designated by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. When the designation is made, the case will be reassigned. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 09/05/23. (ad)
September 5, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Clarify re #19 Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, Motion To Clarify Schedule For Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel by Angeline Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James)
September 5, 2023 MN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel K. Tack not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Court has been notified that the following action is related to and should be consolidated with In re: HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684 (the "Consolidated Action"). Warren v. HCA Healthcare, Inc., No. 3:23-cv-00925 (M.D. Tenn., filed August 30,2023). Pursuant to the Court's August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #19 ), the above-listed related case ("Related Action") is hereby consolidated with In re HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684. All future filings in the Related Action shall be filed in the Consolidated Action, case number 3:23-cv-00684.The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a copy of this Order and the August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #19 ) in the above-listed related case and administratively close that case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 09/01/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
September 1, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE by HCA Healthcare, Inc. Notice of Related Action (Phillips, W.)
August 31, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney Rachel K. Tack to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3902385) by Angeline Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
August 31, 2023 Filing 32 ***DISREGARD***NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad) Modified on 8/31/2023 (ad).
August 30, 2023 DC State Bar status verified as active for Douglas J. McNamara not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
August 30, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sidney W. Gilreath admitted to this court. (ad)
August 30, 2023 CA State Bar status verified as active for Claire Torchiana not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
August 30, 2023 MA State Bar status verified as active for Gemma Seidita not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
August 30, 2023 CA State Bar status verified as active for Sabita J. Soneji not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
August 29, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Gemma Seidita to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3900528) by Arthur Dekenipp. (Chalos, Mark)
August 29, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Sabita Soneji to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3900523) by Arthur Dekenipp. (Chalos, Mark)
August 29, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Claire Torchiana to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3900111) by Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Jennifer Sperling, Leslie Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilreath, Sidney)
August 29, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Douglas J. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3900109) by Rasheed Abdul-Latif, Linda Simon, Jennifer Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilreath, Sidney)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Motion for attorney Kelly K. Iverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed in Case No. 3:23-cv-00794 (Doc. No. 10) before consolidation is GRANTED. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/28/2023.(lh)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Motion for attorney Maureen M. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed in Case No. 3:23-cv-00835 (Doc. No. 14) before consolidation is GRANTED. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/28/2023.(lh)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Motion for attorney Francesca Kester Burne to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed in Case No. 3:23-cv-00740 (Doc. No. 10) before consolidation is GRANTED. Signed by Lynda M. Hill on 08/28/2023. (lh)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Defendant HCA Healthcare, Inc. ("HCA") has notified the Court that the following actions are related and should be consolidated with In re: HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684 (the "Consolidated Action".) The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a copy of this Order and the August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #19 ) in the above-listed related cases and administratively close those cases. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 08/28/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) (Main Document 23 replaced on 8/28/2023) (ad). Modified on 8/28/2023 (ad).
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Defendant HCA Healthcare, Inc. ("HCA") has notified the Court that the following actions are related and should be consolidated with In re: HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684 (the "Consolidated Action"). Pursuant to the Court's August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #19 ), the above-listed related cases ("Related Actions") (see order) are hereby consolidated with In re HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a copy of this Order and the August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #19 ) in the above-listed related cases and administratively close those cases. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 08/25/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
August 25, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by HCA Healthcare, Inc. re #19 Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, Notice of Related Action (Phillips, W.)
August 24, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by HCA Healthcare, Inc. re #19 Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, Notice of Related Actions (Phillips, W.)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This matter, having come before the Court by the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases by their Motion to Consolidate Actions and Set Schedule for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Counsel and Filing of Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Motion") (Doc. No. #10 ), and the Court having reviewed the papers and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED as set forth below. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close all of the Related Actions except Silvers. Any initial case management conferences scheduled in the Related Actions are CANCELLED to be reset by the Magistrate Judge following entry of this Order. All future filings in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under the lead case number 3:23-cv-00684. Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Actions shall file an operative Consolidated Class Action Complaint within 45 days of the Order Appointing Leadership. Defendant's response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be due 45 days after the Consolidated Class Action Complaint is filed. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 08/23/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) Modified on 8/24/2023 (ad).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Eli J. Richardson recused. (Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 08/18/23. (ad)
August 18, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Marissa Alter-Nelson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/8/2023. (ad)
August 18, 2023 NY State Bar status verified as active for Marissa Alter-Nelson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing by HCA Healthcare, Inc. Waiver of Service of Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Phillips, W.)
August 16, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers of Related Actions (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers. HCA Healthcare, Inc. served on 7/19/2023. (Shamis, Andrew)
August 16, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Brantley Phillips, Jr, Kathryn Hannen Walker, Taylor M. Sample, Peter C. Rathmell admitted to this court. (ad)
August 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc. (Phillips, W.)
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by HCA Healthcare, Inc. Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Phillips, W.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This matter is related to Crossman v. HCA Healthcare, Case No. 3:23-cv-00688, which is assigned to Magistrate Judge Frensley. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to Magistrate Judge Frensley for all future proceedings. The initial case management conference set on September 11, 2023, is CANCELLED and will be reset by the assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 07/31/23. (ad)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Set Schedule for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel and for Filing Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers . (Shamis, Andrew)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Set Schedule for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel and for Filing Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Related Cases, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Shamis, Andrew)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: I hereby recuse myself from this action. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/25/23. (ad)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 , [7-2], and [7-4]: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jeff Ostrow, Kristen Lake Cardoso, and Stephen Sukert to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Counsel is instructed to file any future motions separately and not as attachments to a motion. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/18/2023. (lh)
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney JEFF OSTROW, KRISTEN LAKE CARDOSO, STEVEN SUKERT to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $450 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3866261) by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Pro Hac Vice Motion - Steven Sukert, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attachment Pro Hac Vice Motion - Kristen Lake Cardoso, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shamis, Andrew)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 13, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeff Ostrow, Kristen Lake Cardoso, Steven Sukert: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/3/2023. (kc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to HCA Healthcare, Inc. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 9/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HCA Healthcare, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3862921), filed by Richard Marous, Gary Silvers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
July 12, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew J. Shamis, Jeff Ostrow, Kristen Lake Cardoso, Steven Sukert: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/2/2023. (kc)
July 12, 2023 FL State Bar status verified as active for Jeff Ostrow, Kristen Lake Cardoso, Steven Sukert not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc)
July 12, 2023 FL State Bar status verified as active for Andrew J. Shamis admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvers et al v. HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Silvers
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Steven Sukert
Represented By: Andrew J. Shamis
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Marous
Represented By: Andrew J. Shamis
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Steven Sukert
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Hannen Walker
Represented By: Marissa Alter-Nelson
Represented By: Peter C. Rathmell
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor M. Sample
Represented By: Melanie M. Blunschi
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Andrew B. Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gregory Crossman
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marissa Aragon
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Abby Rubenfeld
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Peter Sandstrom
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: Brandon P. Jack
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Greg Marcisz
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: Brandon P. Jack
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laura Delapaz
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joshua Tuttle-Maceina
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrea Abramovic
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: William B. Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Zita Bowers
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michon Coats
Represented By: Abby E. McClellan Paradise
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Barrett J. Vahle
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Brandi S. Spates
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Norman Siegel
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonee Coleman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: Brandon P. Jack
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Suzanne Wallace
Represented By: Kristen Lake Cardoso
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Amanda V. Boltax
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Steven Sukert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ebony Hayes
Represented By: Francesca K. Burne
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Robert B. Keaty, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Janna Nelson
Represented By: Alexandra M. Honeycutt
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Jason H. Alperstein
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: B.W.
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: A.B.
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: J.W.
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Linda Simon
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Sidney W. Gilreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gabriel Vater
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary Del Vecchio
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alana Metcalf
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arthur Dekenipp
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Sabita J. Soneji
Represented By: Gemma Seidita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angeline Hudson
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Charles R. Toomajian III
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Rachel K. Tack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kelsey Hinds
Represented By: David A. McLaughlin
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Nicholas A. Colella
Represented By: Kelly Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brittany Bonecutter
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cynthia Benbow
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scott Dry
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ross Harada
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Danielle Hunter
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tina Martinez
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kaley Palmi
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Phan
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brooke Wallace Schulz
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kathleen Scott
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Meredith Spies
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rebecca Thomas
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Tricia R. Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcus Glascock
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Kim D. Stephens
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Cecily C. Jordan
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: M.R. and D.S.
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sandra Prosser Hahn
Represented By: Ari Y. Basser
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jennifer Sperling
Represented By: Sidney W. Gilreath
Represented By: Claire Torchiana
Represented By: Douglas J. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Leslie Sperling
Represented By: Sidney W. Gilreath
Represented By: Claire Torchiana
Represented By: Douglas J. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rasheed Abdul-Latif
Represented By: Sidney W. Gilreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sarah Martin
Represented By: Hannah R. Lazarz
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?