Lauder et al v. RealPage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mia Lauder and Rachel Meredith
Defendant: RealPage Inc, Greystar Management Services, L.P., BH Management Services, LLC, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, CA Ventures Global Services LLC, University House Communities Group, LLC, Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, B.HOM Student Living LLC, John Does, CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC, Greystar Management Services, LLC, Thoma Bravo L.P., John Does 1-10, Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P. and Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00757
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting (541): Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Clarify Motion to Dismiss Schedule (Doc. No. 541) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order entered August 7, 2023 (Doc. No. 495) is clarified as set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/20/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 11, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing by Mia Lauder, Rachel Meredith, Benjamin Dempsey, Ivonne Arriola Mendieta re (527 in 3:23-md-03071) Amended Complaint,, of Redline Version of First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline for Amended Class Action Complaint)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Berman, Steve)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting (528): Based upon Plaintiffs Unopposed Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants and Substitute Corrected Defendants, (Doc. No. 528) and the record, the Court rules as follows: 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), the Court dismisses without prejudice, certain parties in the identified cases; and 2. The parties agree to certain substitutions and dismissals without prejudice of Defendants in the identified cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/11/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting (525): Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Excuse Live Appearance is GRANTED and Tricia Herzfeld's and Swathi Bojedla's appearance at the September 29, 2023 status conference is waived. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr. on 09/08/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 7, 2023 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) against B.HOM Student Living LLC, BH Management Services, LLC, CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, Greystar Management Services, LLC, RealPage Inc, Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, Thoma Bravo L.P., John Does 1-10, Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P., Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P., filed by Rachel Meredith, Mia Lauder, Ivonne Arriola Mendieta, Benjamin Dempsey.Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Berman, Steve)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting (518): Student Renter Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Deem CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC, Substituted for CA Ventures Global Services, LLC, (Doc. No. 518) is GRANTED and the Clerk shall terminate CA Ventures Global Services, LLC, in each of the above cases and CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC is a Defendant in each case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 08/30/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting (517): Student Renter Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Deem Greystar Management Services, LLC, Substituted for Greystar Management Services, LP, (Doc. No. 517) is GRANTED and the Clerk shall terminate Greystar Management Services, LP., in each of the above cases and Greystar Management Services, LLC is a Defendant in each case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 08/30/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
August 28, 2023 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Student Renter Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Deem CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC Substituted for CA Ventures Global Services, LLC by Gabriel Navarro, Mia Lauder, Rachel Meredith, Benjamin Dempsey, Ivonne Arriola Mendieta. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Berman, Steve)
August 28, 2023 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Student Renter Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Deem Greystar Management Services, LLC Substituted for Greystar Management Services, LP by Mia Lauder, Rachel Meredith, Benjamin Dempsey, Ivonne Arriola Mendieta. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Berman, Steve)
August 28, 2023 Filing 48 SUMMONS returned executed by Rachel Meredith, Mia Lauder. Campus Advantage Inc served on 8/28/2023. (Berman, Steve)
August 28, 2023 Filing 47 SUMMONS returned executed by Rachel Meredith, Mia Lauder. CA Ventures Global Services LLC served on 8/28/2023. (Berman, Steve)
August 28, 2023 Filing 46 SUMMONS returned executed by Rachel Meredith, Mia Lauder. BH Management Services, LLC served on 8/25/2023. (Berman, Steve)
August 25, 2023 Filing 45 SUMMONS returned executed by Rachel Meredith, Mia Lauder. Cardinal Group Holdings LLC served on 8/23/2023. (Berman, Steve)
August 17, 2023 Filing 44 Summons issued as to BH Management Services, LLC, CA Ventures Global Services LLC, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(af)
August 11, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE by ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC, Apartment Income REIT Corp, Brookfield Properties Multifamily LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties LLC, CA Ventures Global Services LLC, CH Real Estate Services LLC, CWS Apartment Homes LLC, CWS Apartment Homes, LLC, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, Conti Capital, Cortland Management, LLC, Crow Holdings, LP, Dayrise Residential, LLC, ESSEX PROPERTY TRUST, Independence Realty Trust Inc, Independence Realty Trust, Inc., Kairoi Management, LLC, Knightvest Residential, Lantower Luxury Living LLC, Mid America Apartment Communities Inc, Mid-America Apartment Communities Inc, Mid-America Apartment Communities, Inc., Mission Rock Residential LLC, Mission Rock Residential, LLC, Morgan Properties LLC, Prometheus Real Estate Group, Prometheus Real Estate Group Inc, Prometheus Real Estate Group, Inc., Related Management Company L.P., Rose Associates Inc, Sares Regis Group Commercial, Inc., Sares Regis Group Operating Inc, Sares Regis Group Operating, Inc., Sherman Associates, Inc., Simpson Property Group LLLP, Simpson Property Group, LLC, The Related Companies L.P., The Related Companies, Inc., Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, Windsor Property Management Company, WinnResidential Manager Corp., Winncompanies, LLC NOTICE PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 7, 2023 ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANTS PARTICIPATING IN EARLY MEDIATION BEFORE CLAY COGMAN Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Grimes, Robert)
August 11, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Cardinal Group Holdings LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Berman, Steve)
August 11, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Campus Advantage, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Berman, Steve)
August 11, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to CA Ventures Global Services, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Berman, Steve)
August 11, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to BH Management Services, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Berman, Steve)
August 9, 2023 Set Hearings per Order 495 : Status Conference set for 9/29/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Oral Argument set for 12/11/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(hb)
August 8, 2023 Filing 38 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Timberline Business Entity Disclosure)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(Peifer, Lee)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER terminating without prejudice the following motions: (323), (326), (327), (335), (337), (340), (343), (344), and (348). Additionally, the Court sets the following deadlines: 1. On August 11, 2023, Defendants shall file a Notice identifying those Defendants who agree to early mediation; 2. No later than September 7, 2023, Plaintiffs shall file a Second Multi-Family Amended Consolidated Complaint, and a First Student-Housing Amended Consolidated Complaint. Also, by this date, the parties shall file a Joint Notice identifying who remains in this action and who does not; 3. By September 21, 2023, Defendants shall identify and briefly describe any new motions to dismiss that they anticipate filing with respect to the Multi-Family Consolidated Complaint, as well as identify and briefly describe all motions they intend to file with respect the Student-Housing Consolidated Complaint; 4. Thirty (30) days after the filing of the Amended Consolidated Complaints, Defendants shall file their Motions to Dismiss. Replies shall be filed fourteen (14) days thereafter; 5. The Court tentatively sets a status conference for 10:00 a.m. on September 29, 2023. By 5:00 p.m. on September 27, 2023, the parties shall file a status report and indicate any issues that should be addressed at the conference; 6. On December 11, 2023, at 1:00 p.m., the Court will hold either a status conference or oral arguments on the Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 08/01/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
August 7, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McIntyre on behalf of MDL 3071 Defendants, B.HOM Student Living LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792(McIntyre, Stephen)
August 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Case Management Conference held on 8/7/2023. Amended Complaints filed by September 7, 2023. Multi-family new motions by September 21, 2023. Plaintiffs Responses due 30 days after filing of motions. Defendants Reply due 14 days after Response. Student-Housing motions by September 21, 2023. Plaintiffs Responses due 30 days after filing of motions. Defendants Reply due 14 days after Response. Current Motions to Dismiss are denied without prejudice. Status reports shall be filed by September 27, 2023, and shall include any issues. A status/scheduling conference will be held on September 29, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Phillips and Cogman available to those who want to pursue early case resolution. Oral argument/status conference will be held on December 11, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. A report of those defendants who agree to early mediation shall be filed by August 11, 2023. The parties shall meet and confer and file a joint report on who is in and who is out by September 7, 2023. (Court Reporter Lise Matthews.) Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792 (Hearing lasted :30) (Parise, Kelly) Modified on 8/7/2023 (lh).
August 4, 2023 Filing 35 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MDL 3071 Defendants, B.HOM Student Living LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Simmons, Ian)
August 4, 2023 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Order Suspending Deadline for Certain Defendants to Respond to Complaints by MDL 3071 Defendants, B.HOM Student Living LLC, Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Simmons, Ian)
August 4, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace A. Fox on behalf of CA Ventures Global Services LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Fox, Grace)
August 4, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Funk on behalf of CA Ventures Global Services LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Funk, Samuel)
August 4, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Simmons on behalf of MDL 3071 Defendants, B.HOM Student Living LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Simmons, Ian)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The Court VACATES its Order dated July 28, 2023, (Doc. No. 432) and approves and appoints Clay Cogman at Phillips ADR to mediate those Defendants in four cases or less, pursuant to the parties agreement. (Doc. No. 467). At the request of former Chancellor Ellen Hobbs Lyle, she is relieved as mediator.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 08/04/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and ALL MEMBER CASES (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting (464): Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Lee A. Peifer to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/04/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(lh)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: All counsel who plan to attend the status conference at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, August 7, 2023, shall notify the Court by filing a Notice of Attendance by 2:00 p.m. (CST) today. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/4/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757(af)
August 4, 2023 GA State Bar status verified as active for Lee A. Peifer not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)
August 3, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by AIR COMMUNITIES REIT CORP, ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC, Brookfield Properties Multifamily LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties LLC, CA Ventures Global Services LLC, CH Real Estate Services LLC, CONAM Management Corporation, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, Conti Capital, Crow Holdings, LP, Dayrise Residential, LLC, ESSEX PROPERTY TRUST, Kairoi Management, LLC, Knightvest Residential, Lantower Luxury Living LLC, Lyon Management Group, Inc., Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC, Prometheus Real Estate Group, Prometheus Real Estate Group Inc, Prometheus Real Estate Group, Inc., Related Management Company L.P., Rose Associates Inc, Sherman Associates, Inc., Simpson Property Group LLLP, Simpson Property Group, LLC, The Related Companies L.P., The Related Companies, Inc., Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, Windsor Property Management Company, WinnResidential Manager Corp., Winncompanies, LLC Amended Second Notice Pursuant to Paragraph 10 of the June 1, 2023 Order Concerning Defendants Participating in Early Mediation Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757(Baldridge, J.)
August 3, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by AIR COMMUNITIES REIT CORP, ALLIED ORION GROUP, LLC, Brookfield Properties Multifamily LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties LLC, CA Ventures Global Services LLC, CONAM Management Corporation, Campus Advantage Inc, Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, Conti Capital, Crow Holdings, LP, Dayrise Residential, LLC, ESSEX PROPERTY TRUST, Kairoi Management, LLC, Knightvest Residential, Lantower Luxury Living LLC, Lyon Management Group, Inc., Prometheus Real Estate Group, Prometheus Real Estate Group Inc, Prometheus Real Estate Group, Inc., Related Management Company L.P., Rose Associates Inc, Sherman Associates, Inc., Simpson Property Group LLLP, Simpson Property Group, LLC, The Related Companies L.P., The Related Companies, Inc., Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, Windsor Property Management Company, WinnResidential Manager Corp., Winncompanies, LLC Second Notice Pursuant to Paragraph 10 of the June 1, 2023 Order Concerning Defendants Participating in Early Mediation Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757(Grimes, Robert)
August 3, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Lee A. Peifer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3880105) by Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from Eleventh Circuit)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Malloy-Thorpe, Jessica) Modified on 8/7/2023 (lh).
August 3, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Malloy-Thorpe on behalf of Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Malloy-Thorpe, Jessica)
August 3, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Berry on behalf of Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00757(Berry, Douglas)
August 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace A. Fox on behalf of Cardinal Group Holdings LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Fox, Grace)
August 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Funk on behalf of Cardinal Group Holdings LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Funk, Samuel)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting (367) Motion to Withdraw. Motion (367) is GRANTED and Doc. No. 364 shall be withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/1/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and ALL MEMBER CASES(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
July 31, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to re (344 in 3:23-md-03071) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Agency Liability filed by Avenue5 Residential LLC, Avenue5 Residential, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, FPI Management Inc, FPI Management, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC, Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC, ZRS Management LLC, ZRS Management, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757(Reinker, Kenneth)
July 31, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to re (110 in 3:23-cv-00334, 89 in 3:23-cv-00440, 137 in 3:23-cv-00358, 66 in 3:23-cv-00419, 166 in 3:23-cv-00378, 117 in 3:23-cv-00336, 148 in 3:23-cv-00331, 83 in 3:23-cv-00415, 98 in 3:23-cv-00388, 115 in 3:23-cv-00381, 149 in 3:23-cv-00329, 16 in 3:23-cv-00552, 206 in 3:23-cv-00339, 124 in 3:23-cv-00379, 141 in 3:23-cv-00391, 132 in 3:23-cv-00338, 138 in 3:23-cv-00411, 106 in 3:23-cv-00356, 323 in 3:23-md-03071, 133 in 3:22-cv-01082, 176 in 3:23-cv-00326, 107 in 3:23-cv-00335, 321 in 3:23-cv-00330, 97 in 3:23-cv-00414, 80 in 3:23-cv-00344, 132 in 3:23-cv-00390, 75 in 3:23-cv-00445, 89 in 3:23-cv-00412, 77 in 3:23-cv-00416, 123 in 3:23-cv-00332, 158 in 3:23-cv-00389, 162 in 3:23-cv-00357, 122 in 3:23-cv-00380, 138 in 3:23-cv-00410, 142 in 3:23-cv-00337, 189 in 3:23-cv-00333, 88 in 3:23-cv-00377, 89 in 3:23-cv-00345, 104 in 3:23-cv-00413, 156 in 3:23-cv-00387) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to LRO and Against the LRO Defendants filed by Equity Residential. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint with Highlighted Allegations Cited by Plaintiffs)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757(Hittinger, Carl)
July 31, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace A. Fox on behalf of Campus Advantage Inc Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Fox, Grace)
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Funk on behalf of Campus Advantage Inc Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00757(Funk, Samuel)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: As requested by the Court, the parties have identified acceptable mediators (Doc. No. 404). The Court approves and appoints the Honorable Layn R. Phillips to mediate cases with Defendants who are in 4 or more cases. To prepare for the mediation the Court hereby sets a telephone conference call on Tuesday, August 1, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Central Standard Time. The participants shall be Jay P. Srinivasan and Patrick Coughlin. Judge Phillips will be on the conference call. Other counsel who wish to participate in the call shall notify the Court no later than noon on July 31, 2023, by calling Kelly Parise or Melissa Seay at 615-736-7013. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and ALL MEMBER CASES(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [*** VACATED BY ORDER (475)***] ORDER: As requested by the Court, certain parties have indicated their willingness to mediate before Chancellor Ellen Hobbs Lyle. The Court approves and appoints Chancellor Lyle to mediate those cases. After further consideration, the Court believes that those Defendants in four cases would also benefit from early mediation before Chancellor Lyle. To prepare for the mediation on October 24, 2023, the Court hereby sets a telephone conference call at 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on Monday, July 31, 2023. The participants shall be Sam Funk, Jay P. Srinivasan, and Patrick Coughlin. Chancellor Lyle will be on the conference call. Other defense counsel who wish to participate in the call shall notify the Court no later than noon on July 31, 2023, by calling Kelly Parise or Melissa Seay at 615-736-7013. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/28/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and ALL MEMBER CASES(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh) Modified on 8/4/2023 (lh).
July 26, 2023 Filing 13 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES NOTICE: The Court provides this Practice and Procedure Notice that applies to all actions transferred to this Court as part of the above-captioned matter, as well as all related actions originally filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court. (lh)
July 26, 2023 Filing 12 Case transferred in from the District of Oregon; Case Number 6:23-cv-01025. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Pursuant to MDL 3071. Certified on 7/26/2023 by Deputy Clerk Vicki Kinkade of the Middle District of Tennessee. (dsg) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) finalized on 7/25/2023. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 7/25/2023. (dsg) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to University House Communities Group, LLC served on 7/20/2023, answer due on 8/10/2023. (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC served on 7/18/2023, answer due on 8/8/2023. (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to B.Hom Student Living LLC served on 7/17/2023, answer due on 8/7/2023. (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to B.Hom Student Living LLC, BH Management Services, LLC, CA Ventures Global Services, LLC, Campus Advantage, Inc., Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, Greystar Management Services, LP, RealPage, Inc., Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, University House Communities Group, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons BH Management Services, LLC, #2 Summons CA Ventures Global Services, LLC, #3 Summons Campus Advantage, Inc., #4 Summons Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, #5 Summons Greystar Management Sevices, LP, #6 Summons RealPage, #7 Summons Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, #8 Summons University House Communites Group, LLC) (jw) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/13/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/11/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 12/11/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 7/14/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to BH Management Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to B.Hom Student Living LLC, #2 Proposed Summons to CA Ventures Global Services, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons to Campus Advantage, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to Cardinal Group Holdings LLC, #5 Proposed Summons to Greystar Management Services, LP, #6 Proposed Summons to RealPage, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons to Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC, #8 Proposed Summons to University House Communities Group, LLC) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9011487 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mia Lauder, Rachel Meredith against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ketterling, Keith) [Transferred from Oregon on 7/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauder et al v. RealPage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Lauder
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Meredith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Advantage Inc
Represented By: Grace A. Fox
Represented By: Samuel P. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Group Holdings LLC
Represented By: Grace A. Fox
Represented By: Samuel P. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Ventures Global Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University House Communities Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberline Real Estate Ventures LLC
Represented By: Douglas Berry
Represented By: Jessica Malloy-Thorpe
Represented By: Lee A. Peifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.HOM Student Living LLC
Represented By: Ian Simmons
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Student Living Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?