Robertson et al v. Upchurch
Plaintiff: David Robertson and Daniel Rodni
Defendant: Ryan Upchurch
Case Number: 3:2023cv00770
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Ryan Upchurch re #14 Notice of Appearance Amended Certificate of Service (Correll, Austin)
August 24, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ryan Upchurch re #13 Notice of Appearance Amended Certificate of Service (Sherwood, Cynthia)
August 17, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 and #14 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
August 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia A. Sherwood, Austin M. Correll admitted to this court. (kc)
August 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Correll on behalf of Ryan Upchurch (Correll, Austin)
August 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Sherwood on behalf of Ryan Upchurch (Sherwood, Cynthia)
August 8, 2023 Filing 12 RECEIPT of Manual Filing by David Robertson, Daniel Rodni re #9 Amended Document to #7 Amended Complaint. USB drive placed in Judge Campbell's box at intake. (kc) Modified on 8/10/2023 (kc).
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by David Robertson, Daniel Rodni re #9 Amended Document (Collective Exhibit of Videos) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Video Files)(Smith, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia A. Sherwood admitted to this court. (kc)
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Rodni, David Robertson. Ryan Upchurch waiver sent on 8/1/2023. (Smith, Christopher)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by David Robertson, Daniel Rodni. Amendment to #7 Amended Complaint . (Smith, Christopher)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Ryan Upchurch, through attorney Cynthia Sherwood on 8/1/2023 by David Robertson, Daniel Rodni. (Smith, Christopher)
August 1, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryan Upchurch, filed by Daniel Rodni, David Robertson.(Smith, Christopher)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/31/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/11/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Ryan Upchurch. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Upchurch (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3875600), filed by Daniel Rodni, David Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
July 28, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Randolph Smith, Christopher W. Smith, Dominick R. Smith admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Robertson
Represented By: Christopher W. Smith
Represented By: David Randolph Smith
Represented By: Dominick R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodni
Represented By: Christopher W. Smith
Represented By: David Randolph Smith
Represented By: Dominick R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Upchurch
Represented By: Austin M. Correll
Represented By: Cynthia A. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?