Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donelson Christian Academy, Inc.
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company and HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. doing business as HUB International Mid-South
Case Number: 3:2023cv00911
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Elizabeth J. Marquardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/12/2023. (lh)
September 7, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth J. Marquardt not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth J. Marquardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3904626) by HUB International Midwest Limited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Eiselstein, Kyle)
September 6, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Emily Alcorn admitted to this court. (kc)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The initial case management conference that was previously scheduled before Judge Trauger, for February 5, 2024, is CANCELLED due to her recusal in this case (Docket No. 11) and is RESCHEDULED for November 16, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. to be held telephonically using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/5/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 31, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Alcorn on behalf of Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. (Alcorn, Emily)
August 31, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle W. Eiselstein admitted to this court. (kc)
August 30, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donelson Christian Academy, Inc.. HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. waiver sent on 8/28/2023. (McWherter, J.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle W. Eiselstein on behalf of HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. (Eiselstein, Kyle)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/30/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
August 30, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nancy R. Steer admitted to this court. (kc)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Leifel, Hannah)
August 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy R. Steer on behalf of Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. (Steer, Nancy)
August 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Parks T. Chastain, Hannah Leifel admitted to this court. (kc)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself in this case. The file shall be returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2023. (kc)
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Leifel on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Leifel, Hannah)
August 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Chastain, Parks)
August 28, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donelson Christian Academy, Inc.. The Cincinnati Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/28/2023. (McWherter, J.)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 Summons issued as to HUB International Midwest Limited Inc., The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 02:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
August 28, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter, Jonathan L. Bobbitt admitted to this court. (ad)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. (ad)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUB International Midwest Limited Inc., The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3898423), filed by Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Policy)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donelson Christian Academy, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donelson Christian Academy, Inc.
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Emily Alcorn
Represented By: Nancy R. Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Represented By: Hannah Leifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. doing business as HUB International Mid-South
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Marquardt
Represented By: Kyle W. Eiselstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?