Haynes v. RealPage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maya Haynes
Defendant: RealPage Inc, Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P., Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P., Thoma Bravo L.P., Apartment Income REIT Corp doing business as AIR Communities, Apartment Management Consultants, LLC, Avenue5 Residential, LLC, Bell Partners Inc., BH Management Services, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, Camden Property Trust, CH Real Estate Services LLC, CONAM Management Corporation, Cortland Management, LLC, CWS Apartment Homes, LLC, Dayrise Residential, LLC, ECI Group, Inc., Equity Residential, First Communities Management, Inc., Greystar Management Services, LLC, Highmark Residential, LLC, Independennce Realty Trust, Inc., Lincoln Property Company, Mid-America Apartments, LP, Mission Rock Residential LLC, Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC, Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC, The Related Companies L.P., Related Management Company L.P., RPM Living LLC, Simpson Property Group, LLC, Crow Holdings, LP, Trammell Crow Residential Company, Windsor Property Management Company, WINNCOMPANIES LLC, WinnResidential Manager Corp., ZRS Management LLC and ECI Management, LLC
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2023cv00979
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re (187 in 3:23-cv-00337, 147 in 3:23-cv-00413, 87 in 3:23-cv-00979, 53 in 3:23-cv-00742, 138 in 3:23-cv-00388, 147 in 3:23-cv-00335, 117 in 3:23-cv-00416, 150 in 3:23-cv-00334, 183 in 3:23-cv-00410, 179 in 3:23-cv-00390, 125 in 3:23-cv-00415, 203 in 3:23-cv-00387, 134 in 3:23-cv-00412, 120 in 3:23-cv-00344, 193 in 3:23-cv-00391, 145 in 3:23-cv-00356, 215 in 3:23-cv-00357, 266 in 3:23-cv-00339, 171 in 3:23-cv-00338, 172 in 3:23-cv-00380, 134 in 3:23-cv-00345, 129 in 3:23-cv-00377, 170 in 3:23-cv-00379, 180 in 3:23-cv-00411, 161 in 3:23-cv-00381, 592 in 3:23-md-03071, 211 in 3:23-cv-00389, 184 in 3:23-cv-00358, 158 in 3:23-cv-00336, 154 in 3:23-cv-00414, 60 in 3:23-cv-00552, 224 in 3:23-cv-00378, 167 in 3:23-cv-00440, 245 in 3:23-cv-00333, 145 in 3:23-cv-00445, 103 in 3:23-cv-00419) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Tricia Herzfeld filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs re: (621 in 3:23-md-03071) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Terms of Service for Rainmaker System Modules)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re (180 in 3:23-cv-00358, 83 in 3:23-cv-00979, 141 in 3:23-cv-00356, 166 in 3:23-cv-00379, 125 in 3:23-cv-00377, 146 in 3:23-cv-00334, 189 in 3:23-cv-00391, 171 in 3:22-cv-01082, 160 in 3:23-cv-00440, 183 in 3:23-cv-00331, 134 in 3:23-cv-00388, 234 in 3:23-cv-00326, 154 in 3:23-cv-00336, 150 in 3:23-cv-00414, 44 in 3:23-cv-00742, 130 in 3:23-cv-00345, 580 in 3:23-md-03071, 141 in 3:23-cv-00445, 168 in 3:23-cv-00380, 121 in 3:23-cv-00415, 116 in 3:23-cv-00344, 143 in 3:23-cv-00413, 209 in 3:23-cv-00357, 183 in 3:23-cv-00337, 176 in 3:23-cv-00411, 380 in 3:23-cv-00330, 99 in 3:23-cv-00419, 175 in 3:23-cv-00390, 113 in 3:23-cv-00416, 177 in 3:23-cv-00410, 207 in 3:23-cv-00389, 56 in 3:23-cv-00552, 167 in 3:23-cv-00338, 158 in 3:23-cv-00332, 241 in 3:23-cv-00333, 157 in 3:23-cv-00381, 130 in 3:23-cv-00412, 143 in 3:23-cv-00335, 199 in 3:23-cv-00387, 262 in 3:23-cv-00339, 220 in 3:23-cv-00378) MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for failure to state a claim as to LRO filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Swathi Bojedla filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs re: (619 in 3:23-md-03071) Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Emails, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Emails)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re (38 in 3:23-cv-00742, 568 in 3:23-md-03071, 77 in 3:23-cv-00979) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Opposition to Apartment Income REIT Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re (79 in 3:23-cv-00979, 218 in 3:23-cv-00378, 570 in 3:23-md-03071, 232 in 3:23-cv-00326, 40 in 3:23-cv-00742, 187 in 3:23-cv-00391, 139 in 3:23-cv-00445) MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, (53 in 3:23-cv-00792, 62 in 3:23-cv-00757, 572 in 3:23-md-03071) MOTION to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Opposition to Dismiss Thoma Bravo Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting (604): Based upon the Unopposed Motion to Deem ECI Management, LLC Substituted For ECI Group, Inc., (Doc. No. 604), Defendant ECI Management, LLC is substituted for ECI Group, Inc. The Clerk shall terminate ECI Group, Inc. as a Defendant in all cases. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/31/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(lh)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting granting (600) and (601): Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Joanne Phuong Duyen Bui and Yixi (Cecilia) Cheng to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/25/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 et al.(lh)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting (596) and (597): Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Amy F. Sorenson and Colin P. Ahler to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/25/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(lh)
October 24, 2023 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party ECI Management, LLC for ECI Group, Inc. by MDL 3071 Plaintiffs, Maya Haynes. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Herzfeld, Tricia)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: The Court has considered the United States Notice of Potential Participation (Doc. No. 599) and approves the request to participate. Accordingly, if the United States decides to participate it shall file its Statement of Intent and supporting Memorandum of Law in Support by November 15, 2023. The United States shall plan to participate in the oral arguments on the pending motion on December 11, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/17/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
October 16, 2023 Filing 95 MOTION for attorney Yixi (Cecilia) Cheng to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certifiicate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Tackeff, Michael)
October 12, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE by United States of America of Potential Participation Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Tackeff, Michael)
October 12, 2023 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Tackeff on behalf of United States of America Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Tackeff, Michael)
October 11, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION for attorney Colin P. Ahler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3930023) by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Miller, Sarah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION for attorney Amy F. Sorenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3930000) by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Miller, Sarah)
October 10, 2023 Filing 90 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Richard P. Sybert on behalf of First Communities Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Sybert, Richard)
October 9, 2023 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Whittaker filed by MDL 3071 Defendants re: (592 in 3:23-md-03071) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, (593 in 3:23-md-03071) Memorandum in Support,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Excerpt from the Medve Group AIRM Presentation, #2 Exhibit B Excerpt from June 2017 Stephens Investor Conference Transcript)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Srinivasan, Jay)
October 9, 2023 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Support of (187 in 3:23-cv-00337, 147 in 3:23-cv-00413, 87 in 3:23-cv-00979, 53 in 3:23-cv-00742, 177 in 3:22-cv-01082, 138 in 3:23-cv-00388, 147 in 3:23-cv-00335, 117 in 3:23-cv-00416, 150 in 3:23-cv-00334, 183 in 3:23-cv-00410, 179 in 3:23-cv-00390, 125 in 3:23-cv-00415, 384 in 3:23-cv-00330, 203 in 3:23-cv-00387, 134 in 3:23-cv-00412, 120 in 3:23-cv-00344, 193 in 3:23-cv-00391, 145 in 3:23-cv-00356, 215 in 3:23-cv-00357, 266 in 3:23-cv-00339, 171 in 3:23-cv-00338, 172 in 3:23-cv-00380, 134 in 3:23-cv-00345, 129 in 3:23-cv-00377, 238 in 3:23-cv-00326, 170 in 3:23-cv-00379, 180 in 3:23-cv-00411, 161 in 3:23-cv-00381, 592 in 3:23-md-03071, 211 in 3:23-cv-00389, 184 in 3:23-cv-00358, 158 in 3:23-cv-00336, 154 in 3:23-cv-00414, 60 in 3:23-cv-00552, 224 in 3:23-cv-00378, 167 in 3:23-cv-00440, 245 in 3:23-cv-00333, 187 in 3:23-cv-00331, 145 in 3:23-cv-00445, 103 in 3:23-cv-00419, 164 in 3:23-cv-00332) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by MDL 3071 Defendants . Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Srinivasan, Jay)
October 9, 2023 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by MDL 3071 Defendants. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Srinivasan, Jay)
October 9, 2023 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support of (581 in 3:23-md-03071) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Agency Liability filed by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC, Avenue5 Residential LLC, Avenue5 Residential, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, FPI Management Inc, FPI Management, Inc., First Communities Management, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC, Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC, Rose Associates Inc, ZRS Management LLC, ZRS Management, LLC . Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Reinker, Kenneth)
October 9, 2023 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support of (180 in 3:23-cv-00358, 83 in 3:23-cv-00979, 141 in 3:23-cv-00356, 166 in 3:23-cv-00379, 125 in 3:23-cv-00377, 146 in 3:23-cv-00334, 189 in 3:23-cv-00391, 171 in 3:22-cv-01082, 160 in 3:23-cv-00440, 183 in 3:23-cv-00331, 134 in 3:23-cv-00388, 234 in 3:23-cv-00326, 154 in 3:23-cv-00336, 150 in 3:23-cv-00414, 44 in 3:23-cv-00742, 130 in 3:23-cv-00345, 580 in 3:23-md-03071, 141 in 3:23-cv-00445, 168 in 3:23-cv-00380, 121 in 3:23-cv-00415, 116 in 3:23-cv-00344, 143 in 3:23-cv-00413, 209 in 3:23-cv-00357, 183 in 3:23-cv-00337, 176 in 3:23-cv-00411, 380 in 3:23-cv-00330, 99 in 3:23-cv-00419, 175 in 3:23-cv-00390, 113 in 3:23-cv-00416, 177 in 3:23-cv-00410, 207 in 3:23-cv-00389, 56 in 3:23-cv-00552, 167 in 3:23-cv-00338, 158 in 3:23-cv-00332, 157 in 3:23-cv-00381, 241 in 3:23-cv-00333, 130 in 3:23-cv-00412, 143 in 3:23-cv-00335, 199 in 3:23-cv-00387, 262 in 3:23-cv-00339, 220 in 3:23-cv-00378) MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for failure to state a claim as to LRO filed by Equity Residential . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Article dated 10/15/20)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Hittinger, Carl)
October 9, 2023 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Agency Liability by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC, Avenue5 Residential LLC, Avenue5 Residential, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, FPI Management Inc, FPI Management, Inc., First Communities Management, Inc., Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC, Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC, Rose Associates Inc, ZRS Management LLC, ZRS Management, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00329, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00757, 3:23-cv-00792, 3:23-cv-00979(Reinker, Kenneth)
October 9, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for failure to state a claim as to LRO by Equity Residential. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:22-cv-01082, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00330, 3:23-cv-00331, 3:23-cv-00332, 3:23-cv-00333, 3:23-cv-00334, 3:23-cv-00335, 3:23-cv-00336, 3:23-cv-00337, 3:23-cv-00338, 3:23-cv-00339, 3:23-cv-00344, 3:23-cv-00345, 3:23-cv-00356, 3:23-cv-00357, 3:23-cv-00358, 3:23-cv-00377, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00379, 3:23-cv-00380, 3:23-cv-00381, 3:23-cv-00387, 3:23-cv-00388, 3:23-cv-00389, 3:23-cv-00390, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00410, 3:23-cv-00411, 3:23-cv-00412, 3:23-cv-00413, 3:23-cv-00414, 3:23-cv-00415, 3:23-cv-00416, 3:23-cv-00419, 3:23-cv-00440, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00552, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Hittinger, Carl)
October 9, 2023 Filing 82 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trammell Crow Residential Company. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Buffmire, Edwin)
October 9, 2023 Filing 81 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crow Holdings, LP. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Buffmire, Edwin)
October 9, 2023 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of (79 in 3:23-cv-00979, 218 in 3:23-cv-00378, 570 in 3:23-md-03071, 232 in 3:23-cv-00326, 40 in 3:23-cv-00742, 187 in 3:23-cv-00391, 139 in 3:23-cv-00445) MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P., Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P., Thoma Bravo L.P. . Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(McKane, Mark)
October 9, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Multifamily Plaintiffs Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P., Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P., Thoma Bravo L.P.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00326, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00391, 3:23-cv-00445, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(McKane, Mark)
October 9, 2023 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Support of (77 in 3:23-cv-00979) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Apartment Income REIT Corp . Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Reilly, Kathryn)
October 9, 2023 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Apartment Income REIT Corp. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Reilly, Kathryn)
October 9, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Byer Miller on behalf of Apartment Management Consultants, LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00378, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Miller, Sarah)
October 6, 2023 Filing 75 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First Communities Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Sybert, Richard)
October 6, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Sybert on behalf of First Communities Management, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Sybert, Richard)
October 4, 2023 Filing 73 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ECI Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment to ECI Group, Inc.s Business Entity Disclosure)Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants RealPage, Inc.'s Motion for Leave for Thomas H. Dundon to Withdraw as Local Counsel for Defendant Realpage, Inc. (Doc. No. 356 in case 3:23-md-03071 and Doc. No. 143 in case 3:22-cv-01082). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr. on 10/02/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (vk) Modified on 10/4/2023 (vk).
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: First Communities Management, Inc.s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. No. 555) is DENIED AS MOOT because previously the Court extended the time for all Defendants to respond to the complaints. (Doc. No. 3). All orders are applicable to parties regardless of when they joined this action. (Doc. No. 3). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/29/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979 (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting (549), (551), (552), and (553): Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jeffrey S. Cashdan, Emily S. Newton, Lohr A. Beck, and Carley H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 09/29/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(lh)
September 28, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Communities Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Mack, Emily)
September 28, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Communities Management, Inc.. (Mack, Emily)
September 27, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for attorney Carley H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3921635) by ECI Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Thompson, Carley)
September 27, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION for attorney Lohr A. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3921631) by ECI Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Beck, Lohr)
September 27, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION for attorney Emily S. Newton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3921618) by ECI Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Newton, Emily)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: It appearing that the parties have no issues for discussion, the status conference set for September 29, 2023, (Doc. No. 546) is CANCELLED. Having reviewed the Defendants Notice of Anticipated New Motions to Dismiss and Renewed Motions to Dismiss To be Filed by Defendants (Doc. No. 544), the Court approves filing the anticipated motions and appreciates the Defendants attention that the Court does not permit incorporation of documents in support or in opposition to motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/27/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number TNMDC-3921586) by ECI Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00979(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2023 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENT filed by CH Real Estate Services LLC re (276 in 3:23-md-03071) Notice of Appearance. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Dickson, Andrew)
September 26, 2023 Filing 61 SUPPLEMENT filed by CH Real Estate Services LLC re (277 in 3:23-md-03071) Notice of Appearance. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Foley, Danielle)
September 22, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria L. Glover on behalf of CH Real Estate Services LLC Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071, 3:23-cv-00742, 3:23-cv-00979(Glover, Victoria)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting (541): Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Clarify Motion to Dismiss Schedule (Doc. No. 541) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order entered August 7, 2023 (Doc. No. 495) is clarified as set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 09/20/2023. Associated Cases: 3:23-md-03071 and All Member Cases. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
September 19, 2023 Filing 58 SUMMONS returned executed by Maya Haynes. ECI Group, Inc. served on 9/7/2023. (Herzfeld, Tricia)
September 19, 2023 Filing 57 SUMMONS returned executed by Maya Haynes. First Communities Management, Inc. served on 9/7/2023. (Herzfeld, Tricia)
September 19, 2023 Filing 56 SUMMONS returned executed by Maya Haynes. Apartment Management Consultants, LLC served on 9/7/2023. (Herzfeld, Tricia)
September 13, 2023 Filing 55 Case transferred in from the District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03813. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2023 Filing 54 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-5 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to USDC Middle District of Tennessee for inclusion in MDL No. 3071. (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Case transferred electronically to USDC Middle District of Tennessee for inclusion in MDL No. 3071. (dnb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket text only) granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time re #53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 9/7/23. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Submission of #53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maya Haynes. (Gastel, Benjamin) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 52 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel J. Nordin. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 51 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Benjamin J. Widlanski. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Shashi K. Gowda. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 49 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel C. Hedlund. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 48 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel E. Gustafson. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 47 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Alexander Sweatman. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 46 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel O. Herrera. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 45 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jennifer W. Sprengel. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 44 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Javier A. Lopez. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 43 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Breanna Van Engelen. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 42 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven M. Berman. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 41 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kenneth S. Byrd. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 40 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kevin E. Rayhill. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 39 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Cadio Zirpoli. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 38 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven Noel Williams. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 37 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph R. Saveri. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 36 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Yifan Kate Lv. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 35 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Walter W. Noss. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 34 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christopher M. Burke. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 33 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Radhika Gupta. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 32 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Peter Demato. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 31 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Vincent Briganti. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 30 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christian P. Levis. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 29 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Hannah Lazarz. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 28 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark P. Chalos. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 27 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Dean M. Harvey. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brendan P. Glackin. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 25 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel J. Walker. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 24 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michaela L. Wallin. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 23 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Eric L. Cramer. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 22 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Dennis James Stewart. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 21 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Katie R. Beran. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gary I. Smith, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 19 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Amanda Boltax. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 18 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Swathi Bojedla. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to J. Austin Hurt. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stephanie A. Chen. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Geoffrey H. Kozen. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Thomas J. Undlin. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stacey P. Slaughter. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Patrick McGahan. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Isabella De Lisi. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to G. Dustin Foster. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael Srodoski. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Amanda F. Lawrence. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Fatima Brizuela. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Carmen A. Medici. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony A. Orlandi. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Tricia Herzfeld. Clerk to follow-up by 9/15/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Patrick J. Coughlin. Clerk to follow-up by 9/11/2023. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lwb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Maya Haynes. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12844063) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/13/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. RealPage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Haynes
Represented By: G. Dustin Foster
Represented By: Gary I Smith, Jr
Represented By: Isabella De Lisi
Represented By: Patrick McGahan
Represented By: Peter Demato
Represented By: Shashi K Gowda
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Swathi Bojedla
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin
Represented By: Tricia Herzfeld
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Alexander Sweatman
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Amanda Boltax
Represented By: Amanda F Lawrence
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Breanna Le Van Engelen
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Represented By: Christian P. Levis
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen
Represented By: Christopher M Burke
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel J Nordin
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: Dennis Stewart
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Fatima Brizuela
Represented By: Hannah R. Lazarz
Represented By: J. Austin Hurt
Represented By: Jennifer W Sprengel
Represented By: Kevin E. Rayhill
Represented By: Javier Asis Lopez
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Kate Lv
Represented By: Katie R Beran
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Michael Srodoski
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: Radhika Gupta
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter
Represented By: Steven M. Berman
Represented By: Walter W Noss
Represented By: Stephanie A. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo Fund XIII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo Fund XIV, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoma Bravo L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment Income REIT Corp doing business as AIR Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment Management Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenue5 Residential, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Partners Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozzuto Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Property Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Real Estate Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONAM Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortland Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWS Apartment Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayrise Residential, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carley Hawkins Thompson
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey Cashdan
Represented By: Lohr Alexandria Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Residential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Communities Management, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Harper Mack
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Residential, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independennce Realty Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Property Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-America Apartments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Rock Residential LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Property Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Related Companies L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related Management Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Living LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Property Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Holdings, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell Crow Residential Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Property Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINNCOMPANIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinnResidential Manager Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZRS Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI Management, LLC
Represented By: Carley Hawkins Thompson
Represented By: Emily Newton
Represented By: Jeffrey Cashdan
Represented By: Lohr Alexandria Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?