Padilla v. 84 Lumber Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Padilla
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Scott Troutt and Eagle Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00985
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by 84 Lumber Company. (Pratt, Paul)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: MOTION #15 GRANTED for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Third Party Complaint. Eagle Trucking, LLC answer due 11/13/2023; Scott Troutt answer due 11/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/31/23. (ad)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 84 Lumber Company, Eagle Trucking, LLC, Scott Troutt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion To Extend Deadline to Respond to Third Party Complaint)(Durrett, Jamie)
October 16, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by 84 Lumber Company. Scott Troutt served on 10/9/2023. (Pratt, Paul)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by 84 Lumber Company. Eagle Trucking, LLC served on 10/9/2023. (Pratt, Paul)
September 29, 2023 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Eagle Trucking, LLC, Scott Troutt. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
September 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for David A. McLaughlin admitted to this court. (ad)
September 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. McLaughlin on behalf of Joseph Padilla (McLaughlin, David)
September 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Eagle Trucking, LLC. (Pratt, Paul)
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Scott Troutt. (Pratt, Paul)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Scott Troutt, Eagle Trucking, LLC, filed by 84 Lumber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Independent Hauler Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Indemnity Demand Letters, #3 Exhibit C - Sept 6, 2023 Acuity Insurance Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Supplemental Denial Letter)(Pratt, Paul)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by 84 Lumber Company.(Pratt, Paul)
September 15, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Russell B. Jordan: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/6/2023. (mg)
September 15, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell B. Jordan admitted to this court. (mg) Modified on 10/30/2023 (af).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/14/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/25/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 84 Lumber Company. (mg)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 84 Lumber Company from Cheatham County Circuit Court, case number 6864. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3911268) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court file, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
September 13, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas J. Aumann, Paul Edward Pratt admitted to this court. (mg) Modified on 9/15/2023 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. 84 Lumber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Padilla
Represented By: Russell B. Jordan
Represented By: David A. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Paul Edward Pratt
Represented By: Thomas J. Aumann
Represented By: Jamie K. Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott Troutt
Represented By: Jamie K. Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eagle Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Jamie K. Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?