McCann v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Jason McCann
Defendant: Randy Jenkins, Kiewit Infrastructure Co., Kiewit Infrastructure South Co., Kiewit Foundations Co. and State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01024
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS returned executed by Jason McCann. All Parties. (Kullander, Lincoln)
November 8, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Jason McCann. All Parties. (Kullander, Lincoln)
November 8, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed by Jason McCann. All Parties. (Kullander, Lincoln)
November 8, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by Jason McCann. All Defendants. (Kullander, Lincoln)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Kiewit Foundations Co..(White, Mary Beth)
November 8, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Kiewit Infrastructure Co..(White, Mary Beth)
November 8, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Kiewit Infrastructure South Co..(White, Mary Beth)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: MOTION FOR EXTENSION #16 GRANTED. Randy Jenkins answer due 11/13/2023; Kiewit Foundations Co. answer due 11/13/2023; Kiewit Infrastructure Co. answer due 11/13/2023; Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. answer due 11/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/07/23. (ad)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint by Randy Jenkins, Kiewit Foundations Co., Kiewit Infrastructure Co., Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
October 19, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dawn D. Carson admitted to this court. (ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Dawn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Sever by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Dawn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company.(Carson, Dawn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn D. Carson on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Carson, Dawn)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/13/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: MOTION #9 for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Granted. Randy Jenkins answer due 11/6/2023; Kiewit Infrastructure Co. answer due 11/6/2023; Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. answer due 11/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/06/23. (ad)
October 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Randy Jenkins, Kiewit Foundations Co., Kiewit Infrastructure Co., Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
October 5, 2023 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kiewit Foundations Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kiewit Infrastructure Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kiewit Infrastructure Co., Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. from Circuit Court in Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 23C1974. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3922870) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
September 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White, Jonathan L. Griffith admitted to this court. (mg)
September 29, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lincoln Kullander: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/20/2023. (mg)
September 29, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lincoln Kullander not admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCann v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McCann
Represented By: Jonathan L. Griffith
Represented By: Lincoln Kullander
Represented By: Lincoln Paige Kullander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Jenkins
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure Co.
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Foundations Co.
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn D. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?