Stover et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Stover and Sonja Stover
Defendant: John Doe, Estes Express Lines, John Doe Company and State Farm
Case Number: 3:2023cv01037
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIRST MODIFIED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2024. All other case management deadlines and provisions found in prior orders and not modified by the Court remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/29/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 6/10/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 5/25/2025. Witness List due by 5/25/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2025. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/21/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2024. Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due November, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/20/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
November 20, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 11/20/2023.(Hearing lasted 0:35)(mcc)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Estes Express Lines. (Bass, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Blake Allan Garner admitted to this court. (af)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Allan Garner on behalf of State Farm (Garner, Blake)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melissa Thompson Richardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/26/2023. (lh)
October 25, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Hunter Joseph Foote admitted to this court. (af)
October 25, 2023 KY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa Thompson Richardson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Melissa Thompson Richardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3938832) by Estes Express Lines. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Eastern District of KY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Western District of Ky Certificate of good standing, #3 Attachment Court of Appeals 6th Circuit Letter of Good Standing, #4 Attachment Court of Appeals 6th Circuit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bass, Elizabeth)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter Joseph Foote on behalf of Estes Express Lines (Foote, Hunter)
October 17, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Blake Allan Garner admitted to this court. (af)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm. (Garner, Blake)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Allan Garner on behalf of State Farm (Garner, Blake)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estes Express Lines. (Bass, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/6/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/20/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Estes Express Lines from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 23C1104. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3925401) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Requests for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
October 4, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth Bass, Blake Allan Garner, Blair Pierson Durham, Chaucey D. Fuller admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Stover
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Represented By: Chaucey D. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Stover
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Represented By: Chaucey D. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes Express Lines
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Represented By: Hunter Joseph Foote
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?