Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. v. The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall, Michael Bowen, Kevin Jones, Jami Averwater, Madelyn Scales Harris, Austin Maxwell, Kirt Wade and Shawn Wright
Case Number: 3:2023cv01044
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' joint motion to set a case management conference (Docket No. #50 ), which is GRANTED. A telephonic case management conference is SCHEDULED for January 9, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. (CT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/20/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 20, 2023 Set Hearing: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/9/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 56 Transcript filed for date of December 4, 2023, before Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Court Reporter: Patty Jennings, 615-939-5450, patty_jennings@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IT IS THE RESPONSIBILITY OF COUNSEL TO REVIEW THE TRANSCRIPT AND REQUEST REDACTION OF CONTENT CLASSIFIED AS PRIVATE UNDER THE NOTICE TO MEMBERS OF THE BAR, ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS, EFFECTIVE MAY 5, 2008, AVAILABLE ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE UNDER THE CM-ECF CASE INFO LINK, GENERAL INFORMATION, ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPTS NOTICE. Intent to Request Transcript Redaction due 12/26/2023. Redaction Request due 1/9/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2024. (Jennings, Patty)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 4/29/2024. Witness List due by 4/29/2024. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/13/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AGREED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN COUNTS AND RELIEF. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/12/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 8, 2023 Filing 53 STIPULATION // Joint Proposed Schedule for Dispositive Motions and Trial by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Hensley, Andrew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 52 STIPULATION // Agreed Order Regarding Dismissal of Certain Counts and Relief by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Hensley, Andrew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. of Plaintiff's Initial Written Discovery Requests (White, Dennis)
December 7, 2023 Filing 50 Joint MOTION To Request Case Management Conference by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright. (Burnett, Samantha)
December 6, 2023 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to re #36 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Individual Defendants in Further Support of Motion filed by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright. (Crane, Cassandra)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: On December 4, 2023, the Court held a status conference to discuss consolidation of Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction with trial. After discussion on the record, the parties agreed that consolidation was appropriate. For the reasons stated on the record, by no later than December 8, 2023, the parties shall jointly: (1) request the Court dismiss Plaintiff's claims for money damages against McFarland and Tindall in their official capacities in Counts XII through XIV as duplicative, which Plaintiff has conceded (see Doc. No. #45 at 18); and (2) file notice proposing trial dates. The parties' notice should also request any changes to the Initial Case Management Order (Doc. No. #34 ) necessary to prepare for trial. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/06/23. (ad)
December 4, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Status Conference held on 12/4/2023. Court considers possibility of combining the preliminary injunction hearing with trial. Parties to provide a joint notice with proposed trial dates by December 8, 2023. Parties also to provide an agreed order regarding the money damages against McFarland and Tindall in their official capacities in Counts 12 through 14. Parties to continue to attempt mediation and settlement discussions. (Court Reporter Patty Jennings.) (Hearing lasted :23)(Seay, Melissa)
November 30, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Individual Defendants with Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Robotti, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Briefing with Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Schell, Jacquelyn)
November 30, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#45 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service.include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
November 30, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#43 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
November 29, 2023 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Individual Defendants filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Robotti, Michael)
November 29, 2023 Filing 44 Transcript filed for date of October 17, 2023, before Judge Barbara Holmes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Roxann Harkins, 615-403-8314, roxann_harkins@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IT IS THE RESPONSIBILITY OF COUNSEL TO REVIEW THE TRANSCRIPT AND REQUEST REDACTION OF CONTENT CLASSIFIED AS PRIVATE UNDER THE NOTICE TO MEMBERS OF THE BAR, ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS, EFFECTIVE MAY 5, 2008, AVAILABLE ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE UNDER THE CM-ECF CASE INFO LINK, GENERAL INFORMATION, ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPTS NOTICE. Intent to Request Transcript Redaction due 12/6/2023. Redaction Request due 12/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2024. (RH)
November 28, 2023 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Schell, Jacquelyn)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Request Status Conference (Doc. No. #40 ) is GRANTED and an in-person status conference is set for December 4, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/17/23. (ad)
November 16, 2023 Filing 41 RECEIPT #300001437 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. re Li Nowlin-Sohl #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (ad)
November 15, 2023 Filing 40 Joint MOTION TO REQUEST STATUS CONFERENCE by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (White, Dennis)
November 15, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright.(Burnett, Samantha)
November 15, 2023 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised 1977 Definition)(Burns, Robert)
November 15, 2023 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of #36 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Individual Defendants filed by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright . (Crane, Cassandra)
November 15, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Individual Defendants by Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright. (Crane, Cassandra)
November 15, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, on Behalf of Craig G. Tindall in his Individual Capacity by Craig G. Tindall.(Crane, Cassandra)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2023. Discovery due by 3/1/2024. The filing of and schedule for dispositive motions is RESERVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/13/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' joint motion to extend the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until November 15, 2023 (Docket No. #31 ), which is GRANTED. By no later than November 15, 2023, Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. No further extensions of this time will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/13/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
November 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 11/13/2023. (Hearing lasted 0:58) (KF)
November 8, 2023 Filing 32 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (White, Dennis)
November 8, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION Set Nov. 15, 2023 as the Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (White, Dennis) Modified on 11/13/2023 (ad).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , and #17 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Michael P. Robotti, Jacquelyn Nicole Schell, Catherine Seibel, D. Alan White, and Andrew M. Hensley to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/26/2023. (lh)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: On October 23, 2023, the Court entered an Order (Doc. No. #28 ) restraining the enforcement of Murfreesboro City Ordinance 23-O-22 and a specific provision in Murfreesboro City Code 21-71 on October 28 and 29, 2023. Accordingly, the hearing on October 26, 2023, set in the Court's prior Order (Doc. No. #18 ), and all associated deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/25/23. (ad)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AGREED ORDER: Solely for purposes of this agreement, "Defendants" excludes Defendant City Manager Craig Tindall and Defendant City Mayor Shane McFarland in their individual capacities. On October 28 and 29, 2023, Defendant City of Murfreesboro, acting through Defendant City Manager Craig Tindall; Defendant City Mayor Shane McFarland; the City's police department; or any other City official or entity, shall not enforce or take any action pursuant to Murfreesboro City Ordinance 23-O-22. On October 28 and 29, 2023, Defendant City of Murfreesboro, acting through Defendant City Manager Craig Tindall; Defendant City Mayor Shane McFarland; the City's police department; or any other City official or entity, shall not enforce or take any action pursuant to the provision of Murfreesboro City Code 21-71 that includes "homosexuality" within the definition of "sexual conduct.". Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/23/203. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 23, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert M. Burns, Samantha A. Burnett, Cassandra M. Crane, Kristin Ellis Berexa admitted to this court. (ad)
October 20, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE/AGREED ORDER by The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee of Submitting [Revised] Proposed Agreed Order on City Ordinance Enforcement (Burns, Robert) Modified on 10/23/2023 (ad).
October 20, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Li Nowlin-Sohl to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 19, 2023 Filing 27 RECEIPT #300001181 in the amount of $750.00 posted by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. re #17 Andrew Hensley Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Catherine Seibel Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Michael Robotti Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 Jacquelyn Shell Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 D. Alan White Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (ad)
October 19, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE/AGREED ORDER by The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee of Submitting Proposed Agreed Order on City Ordinance Enforcement (Burns, Robert) Modified on 10/23/2023 (ad).
October 19, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Ellis Berexa on behalf of Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall (Berexa, Kristin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra M. Crane on behalf of Shane McFarland, Craig G. Tindall (Crane, Cassandra)
October 19, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha A. Burnett on behalf of All Defendants (Burnett, Samantha)
October 19, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of All Defendants (Burns, Robert)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Regarding the preliminary injunction motion (Docket No. #8 ) generally, responsive briefing shall occur as agreed to by the parties as follows. City Defendants' response to the motion must be filed by no later than November 13, 2023, and shall not exceed 25 pages. Plaintiff may file an optional reply by no later than November 28, 2023, which shall not exceed 10 pages. By no later than noon on Friday, October 20, 2023, the parties must file a proposed agreed order regarding enforcement of the subject Murfreesboro City Code sections (or ordinances) during the weekend of October 28-29, when the BoroPride Festival event is scheduled to take place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/19/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.'s (TEP) Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing (Doc. No. #8 ). In accordance with the parties' representations during the telephonic status conference held by the Magistrate Judge on October 17, 2023, the parties shall jointly notify the Court if they resolve the issues raised in TEP's motion and accompanying memorandum. If the parties cannot reach a complete resolution, Defendants shall file their responsive briefs no later than 9:00 a.m. on October 20, 2023, and TEP shall file any replies no later than 9:00 a.m. on October 24, 2023. The Court shall hold a hearing on TEP's Motion (Doc. No. #8 ) at 1:00 p.m. on October 26, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/18/23. (ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Andrew M. Hensley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney D. Alan White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Catherine Seibel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Schell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Michael P. Robotti to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing)(ad)
October 17, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/17/2023. (Tape #Digitally Recorded) (Hearing lasted 1:06) (MCC)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order of October 16, 2023 (Docket No. #10 ), a telephonic case management conference was held on October 17, 2023, to discuss scheduling and other matters related to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. (Docket No. #8 .) A status conference will be held on Thursday, October 19, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. (CT), using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#, for the attorneys to update the Court on the status of their efforts to reach a resolution or, in the absence of a resolution, for the Court to set a briefing and hearing schedule on Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/17/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Notice filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. re #10 Order,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,. (Little, J.)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: A telephonic case management conference will be held on Tuesday, October 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. (CT), using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for notifying Defendants' counsel of this telephonic case management conference. Specifically, and in addition to any other notice, Plaintiff's counsel must promptly upon receipt of this Order, and by no later than 2:00 p.m. (CT) on October 16, 2023, Plaintiff's counsel must provide a copy of this Order on the lawyers with whom Plaintiff's counsel has had discussions about the preliminary injunction motion and who are described in the Certificate of Conference (Docket No. #8 at 4) as "likely to represent the City, City Council, and City Officials in their official capacities and the City Officials sued in their individual capacities" (id.), by email, fax, or other means to ensure the most expeditious notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/16/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. . (Little, J.)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and, MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.. (Little, J.)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/10/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (af)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright. Service copies placed at intake counter to be picked up by counsel. (af)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jami Averwater, Michael Bowen, Madelyn Scales Harris, Kevin Jones, Austin Maxwell, Shane McFarland, The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee, Craig G. Tindall, Kirt Wade, Shawn Wright (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3927281), filed by Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Cooperative Agreement for 2022 BoroPride Festival,, #2 Exhibit B: Beer Permit to TEP Foundation for 2022 BoroPride Festival, #3 Exhibit C: 2022/9/6-2022/9/23 Emails between S. Mac and S. McFarland, #4 Exhibit D: 2022/9/22 Robby Starbuck Instagram Post, #5 Exhibit E: 2022/9/23 Email from S. McFarland to City Officials, #6 Exhibit F: 2022/10/17 Letter from C. Tindall to TEP Foundation, #7 Exhibit G: 2022/10/17 Memorandum from C. Tindall to City Officials, #8 Exhibit H: 2022/10/18 Email from C. Tindall to City Officials, #9 Exhibit I: 2022/11/16 Email from TEP Foundation to N. Williams,, #10 Exhibit J: 2023/4/13-2023/5/26 Communications between ACLU-TN and Counsel for City,, #11 Exhibit K: 2023/6/1 Letter from C. Tindall to TEP Foundation, #12 Exhibit L: 2023/7/7 Letter from ACLU-TN to Counsel for City, #13 Exhibit M: 2023/7/20 Letter from Counsel for City to ACLU-TN, #14 Exhibit N: Murfreesboro City Ordinance 23-O-22, #15 Exhibit O: Murfreesboro City Code Section 21-71, #16 Exhibit P: 2023/9/27-2023/9/29 Emails between A. Tucker and ACLU-TN, #17 Exhibit Q: Transcript of June 15, 2023 Murfreesboro City Council Meeting, #18 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)
October 6, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Alex Little, Stella Yarbrough, Lucas Cameron-Vaughn, Jeff Preptit admitted to this court. (af)
October 6, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew M. Hensley, D. Alan White, Li Nowlin-Sohl, Michael P. Robotti, Jacquelyn N. Schell, Catherine I. Seibel: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/27/2023. (af)
October 6, 2023 GA State Bar status verified as active for D. Alan White not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)
October 6, 2023 AZ State Bar status verified as active for Andrew M. Hensley not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)
October 6, 2023 NY State Bar status verified as active for Michael P. Robotti, Jacquelyn N. Schell, Catherine I. Seibel not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)
October 6, 2023 WASH State Bar status verified as active for Li Nowlin-Sohl not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc. v. The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Equality Project Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Hensley
Represented By: Catherine I. Seibel
Represented By: D. Alan White
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Represented By: Jacquelyn N. Schell
Represented By: Jeff Preptit
Represented By: Li Nowlin-Sohl
Represented By: Lucas Cameron-Vaughn
Represented By: Michael P. Robotti
Represented By: Stella Yarbrough
Represented By: Dennis Alan White, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Murfreesboro, Tennessee
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Council of Murfreesboro, Tennessee
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McFarland
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig G. Tindall
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Kristin Ellis Berexa
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bowen
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jones
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Averwater
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madelyn Scales Harris
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Maxwell
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirt Wade
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Wright
Represented By: Cassandra M. Crane
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Represented By: Samantha A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?