McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. v. Moultry et al
Plaintiff: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Defendant: Terrence Moultry, Lowes Home Centers LLC, Retail Direct, LLC, Spout, LLC and One Reliable Home Solutions Corp.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01056
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Retail Direct, LLC answer due 1/8/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2023. (af)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Lowes Home Centers LLC answer due 1/5/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
November 13, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ryan P. Loofbourrow, Scott D. Carey admitted to this court. (af)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Carey on behalf of Retail Direct, LLC (Carey, Scott)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Loofbourrow on behalf of Retail Direct, LLC (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Loofbourrow on behalf of Retail Direct, LLC (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Retail Direct, LLC. (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond)(Spicer, Richard)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. (Telfeyan, Bradford)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. Lowes Home Centers LLC served on 10/20/2023. (Telfeyan, Bradford)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. Retail Direct, LLC served on 10/19/2023. (Telfeyan, Bradford)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Lowes Home Centers LLC, Terrence Moultry, One Reliable Home Solutions Corp., Retail Direct, LLC, Spout, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 03:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowes Home Centers LLC, Terrence Moultry, One Reliable Home Solutions Corp., Retail Direct, LLC, Spout, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3929275), filed by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)
October 11, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Bradford Telfeyan, Angela Mozdzierz admitted to this court. (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. v. Moultry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Angela Mozdzierz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Moultry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Direct, LLC
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Represented By: Scott D. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spout, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Reliable Home Solutions Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?