Canal Insurance Company v. Schaefer, Jr et al
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Defendant: Jack E. Schaefer, Jr, James Porter Martin and Patriot Truck Lines, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01059
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Parties, having so agreed and stipulated #14 , respectfully request that the Court enter this Stipulation extending the deadline for Defendant PTL to answer, plead, or otherwise move in response to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 11, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/21/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (JOINT) by Patriot Truck Lines, LLC. (Gastel, Benjamin)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Patriot Truck Lines, LLC. (Gastel, Benjamin)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Gastel on behalf of Patriot Truck Lines, LLC (Gastel, Benjamin)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons issued as to James Porter Martin, Patriot Truck Lines, LLC, Jack E. Schaefer, Jr. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/12/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Patriot Truck Lines LLC. (Harwell, Marc)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to James Porter Martin. (Harwell, Marc)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Jack E Schaefer Jr. (Harwell, Marc)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/8/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canal Insurance Company. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Porter Martin, Patriot Truck Lines, LLC, Jack E. Schaefer, Jr (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3929484), filed by Canal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Criminal warrant and disposition, #3 Exhibit B - Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Answer, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts of Deposition of Jack Schaefer Jr)(ad)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Marc H. Harwell admitted to this court. (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Insurance Company v. Schaefer, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc H. Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Schaefer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Porter Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Truck Lines, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?