Concord Music Group, Inc. et al v. Anthropic PBC
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc. doing business as Ariose Music doing business as Capitol CMG Genesis doing business as Capitol CMG Paragon doing business as Greg Nelson Music doing business as Jubilee Communications, Inc. doing business as Meadowgreen Music Compan, Universal Music Corp. doing business as Almo Music Corp. doing business as Criterion Music Corp. doing business as Granite Music Corp. doing business as Irving Music, Inc. doing business as Michael H. Goldsen, Inc. doing business as Universal - Geffe, Songs of Universal, Inc. doing business as Universal - Geffen Again Music doing business as Universal Tunes, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC doing business as Multisongs doing business as Universal Music - Careers doing business as Universal Music - MGB Songs, Polygram Publishing, Inc. doing business as Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc. doing business as Universal - Polygram International Publishing, Inc. doing business as Songs of Polygram International Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC doing business as New Spring Publishing doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Publishing doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Songs doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Tune and ABKCO Music, Inc.
Defendant: Anthropic PBC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01092
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Unopposed Motion to Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/6/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
December 5, 2023 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #57 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Correct the Court's Order in Regard to Page Limits for Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion Briefing by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Riley, Steven)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Briefing of the motion for a preliminary injunction #40 and the motion to dismiss #54 will be concurrent. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction by January 16, 2024, and Plaintiffs shall file any optional reply by February 14, 2024. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss by January 22, 2024, and Defendant shall file any optional reply by February 14, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/1/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 29, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2023. (Hearing lasted 00:23)(sd)
November 27, 2023 Filing 56 JOINT Statement Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. in support of #39 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (Riley, Steven)
November 22, 2023 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support of #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthropic PBC . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jared Kaplan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Model Card and Evaluations for Claude Models, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Anthropic's Terms of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Anthropic's Prior Terms of Service)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 22, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by Anthropic PBC. (Harwell, Aubrey)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #37 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Audrey L. Adu-Appiah to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/21/2023. (lh)
November 17, 2023 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Michael D. Smith filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Smith CV)(Riley, Steven)
November 17, 2023 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Anthropic PBC re #30 Business Entity Disclosure Statement filed by Anthropic PBC. (Harwell, Aubrey)
November 16, 2023 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Dr. Robert Leonard filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix A - Dr. Leonard's CV, #2 Attachment Appendix B - Indirect Claude Response Additional Lyrics, #3 Attachment Appendix C - Entirely Similar Lyrics, #4 Attachment Appendix D - Similar Lyrics with Non-Substantive Dissimilarities, #5 Attachment Appendix E - Similar Lyrics with Missing or Different Lyrics, #6 Attachment Appendix F - Indirect Claude Responses)(Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Dan Seymour filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Compositions by BCG ID, #2 Exhibit B part 1 - Claude Responses to Explicit Prompts, #3 Exhibit B part 2 - Claude Responses to Explicit Prompts, #4 Exhibit B part 3 - Claude Responses to Explicit Prompts, #5 Exhibit C - Claude Responses to Indirect Prompts, #6 Exhibit D part 1 - LyricFind Lyrics, #7 Exhibit D part 2 - LyricFind Lyrics)(Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Timothy Chung filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - O&Z Attorneys and Staff Queries to Claude, #2 Exhibit B - Billboard Article, Google Licenses LyricFind for Search Results, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C -Spotify Web Page, Lyrics, #4 Exhibit D - Musixmatch Web Page, Where will my lyrics be distributed, #5 Exhibit E - Reuters Article, Google-backed Anthropic raises $450 mln in latest AI funding, #6 Exhibit F - Anthropic Web Page, Meet Claude, #7 Exhibit G - Anthropic Web Page, FAQ, #8 Exhibit H - Anthropic Web Page, Claude's Constitution, #9 Exhibit I - Anthropic Trademark Registration No 6,616,966, #10 Exhibit J - Anthropic Federal Trademark Applications, #11 Exhibit K - Anthropic Terms of Service, #12 Exhibit L - Engadget Article, Amazon bets $4 billion on OpenAI rival Anthropic, #13 Exhibit M - Anthropic Web Page, Glossary, #14 Exhibit N - Anthropic Web Page, Introduction to Prompt Design, #15 Exhibit O - Anthropic Model Pricing Chart, #16 Exhibit P - Anthropic Web Page, Introducing Claude Pro, #17 Exhibit Q - Anthropic Web Page, Introducing Claud, #18 Exhibit R - Anthropic Web Page, Product)(Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Ben Y. Zhao filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ben Zhao CV, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Claude Queries and Responses)(Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Bart Herbison filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #41 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (NSAI Board of Directors Letter))(Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Kenton Draughon filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #41 Memorandum in Support, #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 44 DECLARATION of David Kokakis filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #41 Memorandum in Support, #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Alisa Coleman filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #41 Memorandum in Support, #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Duff Berschback filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. re: #41 Memorandum in Support, #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp. . (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Riley, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Joint MOTION Requesting a Scheduling Conference. A conference is set on November 29, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/16/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 16, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Aubrey B. Harwell, III, Nathan C. Sanders, Olivia Rose Arboneaux admitted to this court. (kc)
November 16, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#30 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 16, 2023 Set Hearing per Order #39 : Scheduling Conference is set for 11/29/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Joint MOTION #34 for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefing of Motion for Preliminary Injunction GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/15/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
November 15, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Audrey L. Adu-Appiah to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3955243) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #28 , #29 , #31 , and #32 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Allison Stillman, Sarang Damle, Joseph Wetzel, and Andrew Gass to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/14/2023. (lh) Modified on 11/15/2023 (lh).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 , and #24 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jonathan Z. King, Richard S. Mandel, Richard Dannay, Timothy S. Chung, Andrew L. Guerra, Nicholas C. Hailey, Matthew J. Oppenheim, and Jennifer L. Pariser to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/14/2023. (lh)
November 14, 2023 State Bar status verified as active for Allison Stillman (NY), Sarang Damle (DC), Joseph Wetzel (CA), and Andrew Gass (CA) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (lh) Modified on 11/15/2023 (lh).
November 10, 2023 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefing of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Riley, Steven)
November 10, 2023 Filing 33 Joint MOTION Requesting a Scheduling Conference by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Riley, Steven)
November 9, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for attorney Andrew Gass to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3951963) by Anthropic PBC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 9, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Joseph Wetzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3951962) by Anthropic PBC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 9, 2023 Filing 30 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthropic PBC. (Harwell, Aubrey)
November 9, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Sarang Damle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3951959) by Anthropic PBC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 9, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Allison Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3951957) by Anthropic PBC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
November 9, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Rose Arboneaux on behalf of Anthropic PBC (Arboneaux, Olivia)
November 9, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Sanders on behalf of Anthropic PBC (Sanders, Nathan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey B. Harwell, III on behalf of Anthropic PBC (Harwell, Aubrey)
November 8, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Jennifer L. Pariser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950903) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Matthew J. Oppenheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950900) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Nicholas C. Hailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950897) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Andrew L. Guerra to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950872) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Timothy S. Chung to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950848) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Richard Dannay to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950590) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Richard S. Mandel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950585) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Jonathan Z. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3950575) by ABKCO Music, Inc., Capitol CMG, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., ABKCO Music, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Capitol CMG, Inc.. Anthropic PBC served on 10/23/2023. (Riley, Steven)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/19/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 18, 2023 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Songs of Universal, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Universal Music Corp.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Universal Music - MGB NA LLC. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polygram Publishing, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Concord Music Group, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capitol CMG, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ABKCO Music, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Anthropic PBC. Service packet placed at intake window for counsel pick up. (kc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/18/2023) (kc).
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 1/11/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthropic PBC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3934414), filed by Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., ABKCO Music, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Capitol CMG, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet List of Plaintiffs)(kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2023: #3 Exhibit A to Complaint (List of Works Infringed)). (kc). Modified on 10/18/2023 (kc).
October 18, 2023 State Bar status verified as active for Richard Mandel (NY), Jonathan Z. King (NY), Richard Dannay (NY), Matthew J. Oppenheim (DC), Nicholas C. Hailey (DC), Audrey Adu-Appiah (DC), Jennifer Pariser (NY), Andrew Guerra (NY), Timothy Chung (NY) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
October 18, 2023 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) Modified on 10/18/2023 (kc).
October 18, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard Mandel, Jonathan Z. King, Richard Dannay, Matthew J. Oppenheim, Nicholas C. Hailey, Audrey Adu-Appiah, Jennifer Pariser, Andrew Guerra, Timothy Chung: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/8/2023. (kc) Modified on 10/20/2023 (kc).
October 18, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven Allen Riley, Timothy G. Harvey admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concord Music Group, Inc. et al v. Anthropic PBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol CMG, Inc. doing business as Ariose Music doing business as Capitol CMG Genesis doing business as Capitol CMG Paragon doing business as Greg Nelson Music doing business as Jubilee Communications, Inc. doing business as Meadowgreen Music Compan
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp. doing business as Almo Music Corp. doing business as Criterion Music Corp. doing business as Granite Music Corp. doing business as Irving Music, Inc. doing business as Michael H. Goldsen, Inc. doing business as Universal - Geffe
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc. doing business as Universal - Geffen Again Music doing business as Universal Tunes
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - MGB NA LLC doing business as Multisongs doing business as Universal Music - Careers doing business as Universal Music - MGB Songs
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polygram Publishing, Inc. doing business as Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc. doing business as Universal - Polygram International Publishing, Inc. doing business as Songs of Polygram International Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC doing business as New Spring Publishing doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Publishing doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Songs doing business as Universal Music - Brentwood Benson Tune
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABKCO Music, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Chung
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Audrey Adu-Appiah
Represented By: Jennifer Pariser
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: Nicholas C. Hailey
Represented By: Richard Dannay
Represented By: Richard Mandel
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Andrew L. Guerra
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Represented By: Timothy Seungmin Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthropic PBC
Represented By: Allison Levine Stillman
Represented By: Andrew Gass
Represented By: Nathan C. Sanders
Represented By: Aubrey B. Harwell, III
Represented By: Joseph Wetzel
Represented By: Olivia Rose Arboneaux
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?