Doe v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe and John Doe 1332
Defendant: William Lee and David Rausch
Case Number: 3:2023cv01332
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Joint Motion to Administratively Stay Case #14 is GRANTED and the Clerk shall administratively close this case subject to reopening if any party so requests. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/24/2024. (kc)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion to proceed under pseudonym and protective order is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall proceed under the pseudonym "John Doe 1332." Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/22/2024. (kc)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Doc. No. #10 shall be sealed. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/22/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lester Wickenheiser on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Wickenheiser, David)
January 10, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Lester Wickenheiser admitted to this court. (kc)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 Sealed Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_TBI SORA Entry, #2 Exhibit B_Doe 1332 Declaration)(Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/20/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued as to William Lee, David Rausch. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/21/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
December 19, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead admitted to this court. (ad)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lee, David Rausch (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3976266), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1332
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rausch
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?