Arnold v. Malchow et al
Plaintiff: Edward Ronny Arnold
Defendant: Deborah Malchow, Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01374
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 Motion to Amend Complaint/Plaintiff's Identification of Substitute Suggestion of Death by Edward Ronny Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment - Proposed Summons)(ad)
February 21, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company.(Feeney, John)
February 18, 2024 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Allstate Insurance Company. (Booker, Cyrus)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #16 ), which has become the operative complaint in this case, Defendant Allstate Insurance Company's pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #11 ) is DENIED as moot because it was aimed at the original complaint. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 02/07/24. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (ad)
February 5, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Deborah Malchow, Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, filed by Edward Ronny Arnold.(ad)
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of the Receipt of Defendant's Notification of Service by Edward Ronny Arnold (ad)
January 24, 2024 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Ronny Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Court of Appeals documents)(ad)
January 24, 2024 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's #10 Answer filed by Edward Ronny Arnold (ad)
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Booker, Cyrus)
January 17, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prior Federal Court Complaint, #2 Attachment Prior Federal Court Complaint - Attachment 1, #3 Attachment Court of Appeals Opinion)(Booker, Cyrus)
January 17, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Thomas Feeney, III admitted to this court. (ad)
January 15, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company.(Feeney, John)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Feeney, III on behalf of Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (Feeney, John)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Edward Ronny Arnold. Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company served on 12/30/2023. (ad)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE/Defendant's Notification of Suggestion of Death by Edward Ronny Arnold (ad)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Edward Ronny Arnold. Allstate Insurance Company served on 1/3/2024. (ad)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Depose Allstate Insurance Company Employee by Subpoena by Edward Ronny Arnold. (ad)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
December 28, 2023 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Deborah Malchow, Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. Service copies handed back at intake. (ad)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Deborah Malchow, Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number 300001744), filed by Edward Ronny Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appellate Court Documents, #2 Attachment - Receipt)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Malchow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ronny Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Auto Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Cyrus L. Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?