Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC v. Apollo Vredestein B.V.
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Defendant: Apollo Vredestein B.V. and Apollo Tyres (NL) B.V.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00044
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Motion #15 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is reset for 6/13/2024 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/28/2024. (mg)
February 28, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#15 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
February 27, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION re #6 Notice of Case Management Conference TO RESET by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Boston, Robert)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 and #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Douglas A. Rettew and Patrick J. Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/12/2024. (lh)
February 6, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Douglas A. Rettew from the United States District Court for the District of Maryland in re [DE 7] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Boston, Robert)
February 6, 2024 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Apollo Tyres (NL) B.V. Service copy will be picked up at intake. (ad)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Patrick Rodgers from the United States District Court for the District of Maryland in re [DE 8] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Boston, Robert)
February 6, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Apollo Tyres (NL) B.V.. (Boston, Robert)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Apollo Vredestein B.V., filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Registration certificates and printouts from the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office)(Boston, Robert)
January 25, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 #8 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ad)
January 18, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Patrick J. Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3993163) by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia from)(Boston, Robert)
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Douglas A. Rettew to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3993147) by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing from District of Columbia)(Boston, Robert)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2024 at 02:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (mg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apollo Vredestein B.V. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3990228), filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration certificates and printouts from the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office TSDR database, including Assignment information, for the POTENZA, TURANZA, and ALENZA marks, #2 Attachment 1 - Form A0120 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent Or Trademark, #3 Attachment 2 - Table 1 - Attachment to Form A0120, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
January 12, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Earl Boston admitted to this court. (mg)
January 12, 2024 D.C. Bar status verified as active for Douglas A. Rettew, Patrick J. Rodgers not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
January 12, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Douglas A. Rettew, Patrick J. Rodgers: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/2/2024. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC v. Apollo Vredestein B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Rettew
Represented By: Patrick J. Rodgers
Represented By: Robert Earl Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Vredestein B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Tyres (NL) B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?