Doe v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe and John Doe #59
Defendant: William Lee and David Rausch
Case Number: 3:2024cv00059
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kyle F. Mothershead (Mothershead, Kyle)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Deadline to respond to the Complaint extended until 14 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/26/2024. (mg)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Case pending ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/6/2024. (mg)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for permission to proceed in this action under the pseudonym "John Doe 59". Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/5/2024. (mg)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/5/2024. (mg)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/5/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 5, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
February 5, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
February 5, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 Sealed Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B)(Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order)(Mothershead, Kyle)
February 5, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Lester Wickenheiser, Elizabeth Helen Evan admitted to this court. (mg)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Helen Evan on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Evan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lester Wickenheiser on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Wickenheiser, David)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 Summons issued as to William Lee, David Rausch. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lee, David Rausch (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3993806), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
January 19, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #59
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Represented By: Elizabeth Helen Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rausch
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Represented By: Elizabeth Helen Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?