Nitschke et al v. Blue Hills Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chelsie Nitschke and Cynthia George
Defendant: Blue Hills Holdings, LLC, BNA Investments, GP, Bacar Constructors, Inc. and 906 Studio, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00218
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Continue ICMC. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to June 5, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/15/2024. (am)
April 15, 2024 Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 6/5/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
April 12, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Deadline to Submit Proposed Initial Case Management Order by Cynthia George, Chelsie Nitschke. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order on Unopposed MTN Continuing Initial Case Management Conference)(Calhoun, Eric)
April 8, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Hills Holdings, LLC.(Walthart, Brian)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Blue Hills Holdings, LLC answer due 4/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/26/2024. (mg)
March 26, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew T. Byron admitted to this court. (mg)
March 25, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Walthart on behalf of Blue Hills Holdings, LLC (Walthart, Brian)
March 25, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Byron on behalf of Blue Hills Holdings, LLC (Byron, Matthew)
March 25, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian F. Walthart admitted to this court. (mg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Blue Hills Holdings, LLC. (Walthart, Brian)
March 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Walthart on behalf of Blue Hills Holdings, LLC (Walthart, Brian)
March 22, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Luke H. Neder admitted to this court. (mg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 906 Studio, PLLC. (Neder, Luke)
March 21, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 906 Studio, PLLC.(Neder, Luke)
March 21, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (mg)
March 21, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory Lee Cashion, Joseph Andrew Tisone, Jr admitted to this court. (mg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bacar Constructors, Inc..(Cashion, Gregory)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bacar Constructors, Inc.. (Cashion, Gregory)
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 Summons issued as to 906 Studio, PLLC, BNA Investments, GP, Bacar Constructors, Inc., Blue Hills Holdings, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Eric G. Calhoun) by mail. (mg)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/29/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Blue Hills Holdings, LLC; BNA Investments, GP; Bacar Constructors, Inc.; 906 Studio, PLLC. (Calhoun, Eric)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (af)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 906 Studio, PLLC, BNA Investments, GP, Bacar Constructors, Inc., Blue Hills Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4021732), filed by Chelsie Nitschke, Cynthia George. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)
February 27, 2024 TX State Bar status verified as active for Eric G. Calhoun admitted to this court. (af)
February 27, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew Todd Sandahl admitted to this court. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitschke et al v. Blue Hills Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsie Nitschke
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Matthew Todd Sandahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia George
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Matthew Todd Sandahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Hills Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian F. Walthart
Represented By: Matthew T. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNA Investments, GP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacar Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Tisone, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Lee Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 906 Studio, PLLC
Represented By: Luke H. Neder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?