Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC v. Change Healthcare Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare, Inc. and Optum, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00331
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 , #11 , and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jennifer R. Scullion, Justin M. Smigelsky, and Christopher L. Ayers to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/19/2024. (lh)
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC (Spragens, John)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Christopher L. Ayers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4057653) by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ayers COGS - Apex)(Spragens, John)
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Justin M. Smigelsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4057652) by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Smigelsky COGS - Apex)(Spragens, John)
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jennifer R. Scullion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4057651) by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scullion COGS - Apex)(Spragens, John)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This matter is related to Merry v. Change Healthcare, Inc., Case No. 3:24-cv-00239, which is assigned to Magistrate Judge Frensley. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to Magistrate Judge Frensley for all future proceedings. The initial case management conference set on May 29, 2024, is CANCELLED and will be reset by the assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/4/2024. (kc)
March 25, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jennifer R. Scullion, Christopher L. Ayers, Justin M. Smigelsky, Nigel Halliday: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/15/2024. (mg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC.(Spragens, John)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/22/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/29/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Change Healthcare Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel ( John Spragens) by mail. (mg)
March 22, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Tate Spragens admitted to this court. (mg)
March 22, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jennifer R. Scullion, Christopher L. Ayers, Justin M. Smigelsky, Nigel Halliday: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/12/2024. (mg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Change Healthcare Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4039053), filed by Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC v. Change Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apex Physical Rehabilitation & Wellness PLLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Ayers
Represented By: Jennifer R. Scullion
Represented By: John Tate Spragens
Represented By: Justin M. Smigelsky
Represented By: Nigel Halliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?