Baker v. Sumner County et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Baker
Defendant: Sumner County, Gary #455 and Bouchard #534
Case Number: 3:2024cv00376
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Plaintiff has submitted an Application for Leave for Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP Application"). (Doc. No. #13 ). Plaintiff's IFP Application reflects that he is unable to bear the costs of paying the filing fee in this case. Therefore, Plaintiff's IFP Application (Doc. No. #13 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Section 1983 excessive force claim against C/O Bouchard in his individual capacity fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and is therefore DISMISSED. Plaintiff's Section 1983 official capacity claims against C/Os Gary and Bouchard, which are claims against Sumner County, are superfluous and therefore DISMISSED. Plaintiff's Motion to Ascertain Status (Doc. No. #11 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Plaintiff is advised that process cannot be served upon any Defendant until the full name of the individual involved in the alleged incident has been determined. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/22/2024. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 16, 2024 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kevin Baker. (am)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Since Plaintiff is no longer a prisoner, he does not need the statement. He must complete a pauper application for non-prisoners if he wishes to proceed without prepaying fees or costs. Therefore, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff AO Form 239, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) for Plaintiff's convenience. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he must return the completed application to the Court within 30 days of entry of this Order or submit the full civil filing fee. If Plaintiff no longer wishes to pursue this action, he is not required to file anything else. The Court will dismiss this action after 30 days if Plaintiff has taken no further action by then. Plaintiff may request an extension of time to comply with this Order so long as the request is made in writing within 30 days of entry of this Order. Floyd v. United States Postal Service, 105 F.3d 274, 279 (6th Cir. 1997), superseded on other grounds by Rule 24, Fed. R. App. P. Plaintiff's IFP Application for prisoners (Doc. No. #2 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/6/2024. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with AO Form 239. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Ascertain Status by Kevin Baker. (am)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Baker. (am)
April 24, 2024 Filing 9 Letter re Trust Fund Account Statement from Kevin Baker. (am)
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT filed by Kevin Baker re #1 Complaint. (kc)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Baker. Address updated this date. (kc)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To proceed as a pauper, Plaintiff MUST submit the required certified statement within 30 days of entry of this Order. The required certified statement need not be notarized. The jail custodian of Plaintiff's inmate account should simply sign and date the inmate trust fund statement (which makes the statement "certified"). Plaintiff cannot certify his own statement. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/10/2024. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT filed by Kevin Baker re #1 Complaint. (af)
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kevin Baker. (ad)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bouchard #534, Gary #455, Sumner County, filed by Kevin Baker.(ad)
April 3, 2024 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Sumner County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary #455
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard #534
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?